Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2801679 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201110431111 EP12860227



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015040508Global Dossier 12.02.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN01714 19.12.2012
CN201110431111 21.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6181667BGlobal Dossier 16.08.2017B2
JP2015510054 02.04.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2012CN01714 19.12.2012
CN201110431111 21.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2859839Global Dossier 10.05.2016C
CA2859839 27.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN01714 19.12.2012
CN201110431111 21.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2801679Global Dossier 08.05.2019B1
EP2801679 16.12.2015A4
EP2801679 12.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN01714 19.12.2012
CN201110431111 21.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2012357542B 10.12.2015B2
AU2012357542 17.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN01714 19.12.2012
CN201110431111 21.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013091284Global Dossier 27.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
CN201110431111 21.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN102493625BGlobal Dossier 10.12.2014B
CN102493625 13.06.2012A
Priority number Date
CN201110431111 21.12.2011