Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795338

EP2795338 - CONGESTIVE HEART FAILURE BIOMARKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.05.2016  [2016/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nuclea Biotechnologies, Inc.
46 Elm Street
Pittsfield, MA 01201 / US
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / MURACA, Patrick J.
8A Stratford Avenue
Pittsfield Massachusetts 01201 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Forstmeyer, Dietmar , et al
BOETERS & LIECK
Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date12860250.520.12.2012
WO2012US70771
Priority number, dateUS201161578522P21.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161578522 P
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013096534
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795338
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:BIOMARKER FÜR KONGESTIVE HERZINSUFFIZIENZ[2014/44]
English:CONGESTIVE HEART FAILURE BIOMARKERS[2014/44]
French:BIOMARQUEURS D'INSUFFISANCE CARDIAQUE CONGESTIVE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase21.07.2014National basic fee paid 
21.07.2014Search fee paid 
21.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
12.04.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[IA]WO2007116199  (IMP INNOVATIONS LTD [GB]; EDWARDS ROBERT JOHN [GB]; SALAM VAHITHA BANU) [I] 9 * abstract * [A] 1-8,10;
 [IA]WO2011024107  (SEMMELWEIS UNIVERSITY [HU]; PROHASZKA ZOLTAN [HU]; GOMBOS TIMEA [HU];) [I] 9 * abstract * [A] 1-8,10;
 [IA]WO2009040133  (UNIVERSITAETSKLINIKUM HEIDELBE [DE]; FREY NORBERT [DE]; ROSENBERG MARK) [I] 9 * claims 1-22 * [A] 1-8,10;
 [IA]US2008057590  (URDEA MICKEY [US] ET AL) [I] 9 * abstract * * page 50 * [A] 1-8,10
 [X]  - WALKER S J ET AL, "Long versus short oligonucleotide microarrays for the study of gene expression in nonhuman primates", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHER B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 152, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.JNEUMETH.2005.09.007, ISSN 0165-0270, (20060415), pages 179 - 189, (20060415), XP024996904 [X] 8,10 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jneumeth.2005.09.007
 [X]  - "Affymetrix GeneChip Human Genome U133 Array Set HG-U133A", GEO,, (20020311), XP002254749 [X] 8,10 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2008057590  (URDEA ET AL);
 [Y]US2011144019  (UNEMORI ET AL);
 [A]US2004082613  (SCHNEIDER ET AL);
 [A]US2009325163  (HELGADOTTIR ET AL)