Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2794647

EP2794647 - NOVEL GH-RH ANALOGS WITH POTENT AGONISTIC EFFECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University Of Miami
1400 NW 10th Avenue
Suite 1200
Miami, Florida 33136 / US
For all designated states
United States of America Represented by the Department of Veterans Affairs
810 Vermont Avenue NW (12TT)
Washington, DC 20430 / US
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHALLY, Andrew, V.
3801 Mosaic Condo Unit 1506
Miami Beach, FL 33140 / US
02 / CAI, Ren-Zhi
1200 Brickell Bay Dr.
Apt. 2109
Miami, FL 33131 / US
03 / ZARANDI, Marta
Ducovice 25
6721 Szeged / HU
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[2019/13]
Former [2014/44]Fyfe, Fiona Allison Watson
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date12860298.404.12.2012
[2019/13]
WO2012US67690
Priority number, dateUS20111333262421.12.2011         Original published format: US201113332624
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013095903
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2794647
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2794647
Date:27.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/60, A61K38/25, A61K38/00, C07K14/61
[2015/44]
Former International [2014/44]C07K14/60, A61K38/25
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUE GH-RH-ANALOGA MIT STARKER AGONISTISCHER WIRKUNG[2014/44]
English:NOVEL GH-RH ANALOGS WITH POTENT AGONISTIC EFFECTS[2014/44]
French:NOUVEAUX ANALOGUES GH-RH AYANT DES EFFETS AGONISTES PUISSANTS[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2014National basic fee paid 
13.06.2014Search fee paid 
13.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
01.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2019Fee for grant paid
04.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.06.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES27.03.2019
FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
[2019/47]
Former [2019/46]FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2011153491  (UNIV MIAMI [US]; US DEPT VETERANS AFFAIRS [US]; SCHALLY ANDREW VICTOR) [A] 1-6,11-15,19;
 [A]WO9012810  (SALK INST FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDI [US]) [A] 1-6,11-15,19;
 [A]WO9622782  (UNIV TULANE [US]) [A] 1-6,11-15,19;
 [A]WO03037928  (INST FARMACEUTYCZNY [PL]; IZDEBSKI JAN [PL]; KUNCE DANUTA [PL]; ORLOWS) [A] 1-6,11-15,19 * the whole document *
 [I]  - IZDEBSKI ET AL, "Synthesis and biological evaluation of superactive agonists of growth hormone-releasing hormone", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (19950501), vol. 92, no. 11, doi:10.1073/PNAS.92.11.4872, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 4872 - 4876, XP002102102 [I] 1,2,11,12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.11.4872
 [A]  - ZARANDI M ET AL, "POTENT AGONISTS OF GROWTH HORMONE-RELEASING HORMONE PART I", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE AND PROTEIN RESEARCH, MUNKSGAARD, COPENHAGEN, DK, (19920301), vol. 39, no. 3, ISSN 0367-8377, pages 211 - 217, XP000264169 [A] 1-6,11-15,19
 [A]  - CAMPBELL R M ET AL, "RATIONAL DESIGN, SYNTHESIS AND BIOLOGICAL EVALUATION OF NOVEL GROWTH HORMONE RELEASING FACTOR ANALOGUES", BIOPOLYMERS, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, US, (19950101), vol. 37, no. 2, doi:10.1002/BIP.360370204, ISSN 0006-3525, pages 67 - 88, XP008007073 [A] 1-6,11-15,19

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bip.360370204
 [A]  - WITKOWSKA E W A ET AL, "TRYPTIC HYDROLYSIS OF HGH-RH(1-29)-NH2 ANALOGUES CONTAINING LYS OR ORN IN POSITIONS 21 AND 21", JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE SCIENCE, JOHN WILEY AND SONS LTD, GB, (20010101), vol. 7, doi:10.1002/PSC.316, ISSN 1075-2617, pages 166 - 172, XP008020276 [A] 1-6,11-15,19

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/psc.316
International search[X]US2010092539  (SCHALLY, ANDREW ET AL.);
 [X]US7268113  (BRIDON, DOMINIQUE P. ET AL.);
 [A]US2007042950  (SCHALLY, ANDREW V. ET AL.);
 [A]US7241744  (DRAGHIA-AKLI, RUXANDRA ET AL.);
 [A]US5846936  (FELIX, ARTHUR MARTIN ET AL.);
 [A]US5756458  (KUBIAK, TERESA M. ET AL.)
Examination   - CAI RENZHI ET AL, "Synthesis of new potent agonistic analogs of growth hormone-releasing hormone (GHRH) and evaluation of their endocrine and cardiac activities", PEPTIDES, (20131225), vol. 52, doi:10.1016/J.PEPTIDES.2013.12.010, ISSN 0196-9781, pages 104 - 112, XP028624033

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.peptides.2013.12.010
by applicantUS4622312
 US4649131
 US4784987
 US4914189
 US4689318
 WO9411396
 WO9411397
 EP0413839
 US5262519
 US5792747
 US7928063
 US6458764
 US2009023646
 WO2009009727
    - CAMBELL RM et al., Peptides, (19910000), vol. 12, pages 569 - 574
    - BAJUSZ S et al., Peptides, (19820000), pages 643 - 647
    - FELIX A et al., Int. J. Peptide Protein Res., (19880000), vol. 32, pages 441 - 454
    - KOVACS M et al., Life Sci., (19880000), vol. 42, pages 27 - 35
    - ZARANDI M et al., Int. J. Peptide Protein Res., (19900000), vol. 36, pages 499 - 505
    - ZARANDI M et al., Int. J. Peptide Protein Res., (19920000), vol. 39, pages 211 - 217
    - MURANICHI S et al., Pharm. Res., (19910000), vol. 8, pages 649 - 652
    - FERNINANDI ES et al., Basic Clin Pharmacol Toxicol., (20070000), vol. 100, pages 49 - 58
    - FALUTZ J et al., Acquir Immune Defic Syndr, (20100000), vol. 53, pages 311 - 322
    - FROHMAN et al., J. Clin. Invest., (19890000), vol. 83, pages 1533 - 1540
    - KUBIAK et al., Drug Met. Disp., (19890000), vol. 17, pages 393 - 397
    - BOULANGER et al., Brain Res., (19930000), vol. 616, pages 39 - 47
    - European J. Biochem., (19840000), vol. 138, pages 9 - 37
    - MERRIFIELD, J.Am.Chem.Soc, (19630000), vol. 85, page 2149
    - VANCE, M. L, N.Eng.J.Med, (19900000), vol. 323, pages 52 - 54
    - LANTOS J. et al., JAMA, (19890000), vol. 261, pages 1020 - 1024
    - MILES I. E. M. et al., Lancet ii, (19680000), pages 492 - 493
    - O'DELL W et al., J.Lab.Clin.Med., (19670000), vol. 70, pages 973 - 80
    - KORPAS et al., J. Clin. Endoc. Metabol., (19920000), vol. 75, pages 530 - 535
    - TAKANO K et al., Endocrinol. Japan, (19880000), vol. 35, pages 775 - 781
    - THORNER M. O. et al., N.Engl.J.Med., (19850000), vol. 312, pages 4 - 9
    - ROSS R. J. M. et al., Lancet, (19870000), vol. 1, pages 5 - 8
    - CORPAS et al., J. Clin. Endocrin. Metabol., (19920000), vol. 75, pages 530 - 535
    - KIRK J. M. W. et al., Clinical Endocrinol., (19940000), vol. 41, pages 487 - 493
    - ZARANDI M; SERFOZO P; ZSIGO J; BOKSER L; JANAKY T; OLSEN DB; BAJUSZ S; SCHALLY AV, Int. J. Peptide Protein Res., (19920000), vol. 39, pages 211 - 217
    - HALMOS G et al., Receptor, (19930000), vol. 3, pages 87 - 97
    - IZDEBSKI J et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19950000), vol. 92, pages 4872 - 4876