Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797037

EP2797037 - ELECTRONIC MOLD COUNTER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HR, IS, LV, RS
published on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PS Tech Co. Ltd.
5F., 46, Wangsimni-ro
Seongdong-gu
Seoul 133-821 / KR
For all designated states
Best Information Technology Co., Ltd.
1207ho, 12F.
63, Seochojungang-ro
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-912 / KR
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / YU, Kwang Taig
B-302 Hyosung Apt.
923-18 Hwagok 1-dong
Gangseo-gu
Seoul 157-910 / KR
02 / PARK, Soo Chul
1003-1411 Kkachi Maeul Apt.
746 Suseo-dong
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 135-520 / KR
03 / HAN, Guy Seok
2 Floor 397-3 Suyu-dong
Gangbuk-gu
Seoul 412-070 / KR
04 / KIM, Han Jin
2 Floor 103-105 Ssangmun 3-dong
Dobong-gu
Seoul 132-033 / KR
05 / LEE, Sang Hun
Basement 1
612-10 Seongsan-dong
Mapo-gu
Seoul 121-250 / KR
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[2019/06]
Former [2014/44]Herzog, Markus , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date12860304.017.12.2012
[2019/06]
WO2012KR11013
Priority number, dateKR2011013776219.12.2011         Original published format: KR 20110137762
[2014/44]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013094948
Date:27.06.2013
Language:KO
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2797037
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2797037
Date:06.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06M1/10, B29C45/17
[2015/36]
Former International [2014/44]G06M1/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZÄHLERVORRICHTUNG FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE FORMEN[2014/44]
English:ELECTRONIC MOLD COUNTER DEVICE[2014/44]
French:DISPOSITIF COMPTEUR DE MOULE ÉLECTRONIQUE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase15.07.2014Translation filed 
15.07.2014National basic fee paid 
15.07.2014Search fee paid 
15.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
18.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2018Fee for grant paid
18.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.12.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
[2019/39]
Former [2019/38]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]US2010320632  (STARKEY GLENN [US]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0020] - [0027]; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US5571539  (STARKEY GLENN [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 17 *;
 [A]SU752410  (OBVINTSEV SERGEJ N [SU]) [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[A]KR101045286B  (DAE YOUNG ONE. CO., LTD);
 [A]JP2009218116  (FUJITSU COMPONENT LTD);
 [A]KR20070093671  (KIM, JAE MAN)