Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2796576

EP2796576 - TUNGSTEN ALLOY, AND TUNGSTEN ALLOY PART, DISCHARGE LAMP, TRANSMITTING TUBE AND MAGNETRON USING TUNGSTEN ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
For all designated states
Toshiba Materials Co., Ltd.
8 Shinsugita-Cho Isogo-Ku Yokohama-Shi
Kanagawa 235-8522 / JP
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAMOTO, Shinichi
c/o TOSHIBA MATERIALS CO. LTD.
8 Shinsugita-cho
Isogo-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 235-8522 / JP
02 / NAKANO, Kayo
c/o TOSHIBA MATERIALS CO. LTD.
8 Shinsugita-cho
Isogo-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 235-8522 / JP
03 / HORIE, Hiromichi
c/o TOSHIBA MATERIALS CO. LTD.
8 Shinsugita-cho
Isogo-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 235-8522 / JP
04 / SANO, Takashi
c/o TOSHIBA MATERIALS CO. LTD.
8 Shinsugita-cho
Isogo-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 235-8522 / JP
05 / MINAMI, Yoshiko
c/o TOSHIBA MATERIALS CO. LTD.
8 Shinsugita-cho
Isogo-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 235-8522 / JP
06 / YAMAGUCHI, Satoshi
c/o TOSHIBA MATERIALS CO. LTD.
8 Shinsugita-cho
Isogo-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 235-8522 / JP
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date12860308.120.12.2012
WO2012JP83106
Priority number, dateJP2011027894420.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011278944
JP2012015001703.07.2012         Original published format: JP 2012150017
[2014/44]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013094695
Date:27.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2796576
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:C22C1/04, C22C27/04, B22F3/10, B22F3/24
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:WOLFRAMLEGIERUNG UND WOLFRAMLEGIERUNGSTEIL, ENTLADUNGSLAMPE, ÜBERTRAGUNGSROHR UND MAGNETRON MIT DER WOLFRAMLEGIERUNG[2014/44]
English:TUNGSTEN ALLOY, AND TUNGSTEN ALLOY PART, DISCHARGE LAMP, TRANSMITTING TUBE AND MAGNETRON USING TUNGSTEN ALLOY[2014/44]
French:ALLIAGE DE TUNGSTÈNE, PIÈCE EN ALLIAGE DE TUNGSTÈNE, LAMPE À DÉCHARGE, TUBE DE TRANSMISSION ET MAGNÉTRON UTILISANT UN ALLIAGE DE TUNGSTÈNE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase20.06.2014Translation filed 
20.06.2014National basic fee paid 
20.06.2014Search fee paid 
20.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
08.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]JPH08260070  (NAT RES INST METALS) [X] 1-16 * figures 1-3; example 1 * [I] 17-23
International search[X]JP2006102775  (NIPPON TANGSTEN CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2008539332  (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.);
 [Y]JP2007113104  (TOSHIBA CORP.);
 [Y]JP2009102670  (TOSHIBA CORP.)
by applicantJP2002226935
 JP2011103240
 JP4741190B