Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2796576


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.10.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
29.04.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
30.12.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.08.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.04.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.12.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.09.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.04.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.04.2017 First examination report
16.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
14.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.09.2015 Change - classification published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
11.09.2015 Change - classification published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
11.09.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
27.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
13.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
26.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication