Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793848

EP2793848 - NAVY BEAN EXTRACT TO WHITEN THE SKIN AND IMPROVE SKIN TONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/44]COMBINATION OF PLANT EXTRACTS TO IMPROVE SKIN TONE
[2017/24]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mary Kay, Inc.
16251 N Dallas Parkway
Addison, TX 75001 / US
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / FLORENCE, Tiffany
c/o Mary Kay Inc.
16251 N. Dallas Parkway
Addison, TX 75001 / US
02 / GAN, David
c/o Mary Kay Inc.
16251 N. Dallas Parkway
Addison, TX 75001 / US
03 / HINES, Michelle
c/o Mary Kay Inc.
16251 N. Dallas Parkway
Addison, TX 75001 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[2019/26]
Former [2014/44]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date12860455.019.12.2012
[2019/26]
WO2012US70681
Priority number, dateUS201161577462P19.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161577462 P
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013096485
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793848
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793848
Date:26.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61Q19/02, A61K8/9789
[2019/02]
Former International [2017/24]A61K8/97, A61Q19/02
Former International [2015/43]A61K8/97, A61Q19/02, A61K36/48
Former International [2014/44]A61K8/97, A61Q19/02, A61Q19/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WEISSE (NAVY) GARTENBOHNEN EXTRAKT ZUR HAUTAUFHELLUNG UND ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER HAUTFARBE[2019/04]
English:NAVY BEAN EXTRACT TO WHITEN THE SKIN AND IMPROVE SKIN TONE[2017/24]
French:EXTRAIT D'HARICOT BLANC (NAVY) POUR BLANCHIR LA PEAU ET AMÉLIORER LE TEINT DE LA PEAU[2017/24]
Former [2014/44]KOMBINATION AUS PFLANZENEXTRAKTEN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES HAUTTONS
Former [2014/44]COMBINATION OF PLANT EXTRACTS TO IMPROVE SKIN TONE
Former [2014/44]COMBINAISON D'EXTRAITS DE PLANTES DESTINÉE À AMÉLIORER LE TEINT DE LA PEAU
Entry into regional phase14.07.2014National basic fee paid 
14.07.2014Search fee paid 
14.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
16.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.2019Fee for grant paid
14.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19181364.1  / EP3566691
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.07.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
[2019/47]
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2010303854  (HINES MICHELLE [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0011] , [0015] , [0057] * [Y] 1-17;
 [XA]EP1967198  (INDENA SPA [IT]) [X] 11-17 * paragraph [0007]; example - * [A] 1-10;
 [Y]US2008058281  (YATES PAULA R [GB], et al) [Y] 1-17 * page 1, paragraphs 2,3,17 * * page 2, paragraph 22 * * example - *;
 [Y]US2010068318  (MILJKOVIC DUSAN [US]) [Y] 1-17 * page 1, paragraphs 6-9 *;
 [A]US2009042846  (GUPTA SHYAM K [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0005] , [0080] *
International search[X]US2010303854  (HINES MICHELLE [US], et al);
 [Y]KR20030089710  (TOYO HAKKO LTD.);
 [Y]KR20010000479  (LEE JEONG SIM [KR]);
 [A]KR20060106310  (AN IN KYOUNG [KR]);
 [A]KR20110117376  (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR]);
 [A]KR20100021088  (NAM GU KWANG JU CITY [KR], et al)
Examination   - "Phaseolus Vulgaris (Kidney Bean) seed extract", International Cosmetic Ingredient Dictionary and Handbook - Thirteenth Edition, Personal Care Products Council, (20101201), vol. 2, page 2228