Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2793848 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280062724 CN201810004778 EP12860455



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018085302Global Dossier 29.03.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201715828694 01.12.2017
US201161577462 19.12.2011
US201213720557 19.12.2012
US201514827835 17.08.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9861573Global Dossier 09.01.2018B2
US2015352036 10.12.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201161577462 19.12.2011
US201213720557 19.12.2012
US201514827835 17.08.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9138401Global Dossier 22.09.2015B2
US2013156873 20.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161577462 19.12.2011
US201213720557 19.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20140107545Global Dossier 04.09.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161577462 19.12.2011
WO2012US70681 19.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107961192Global Dossier 27.04.2018A
Priority number Date
US201161577462 19.12.2011
CN201280062724 19.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103998022BGlobal Dossier 30.01.2018B
CN103998022 20.08.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161577462 19.12.2011
WO2012US70681 19.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2859419Global Dossier 16.10.2018C
CA2859419 27.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161577462 19.12.2011
WO2012US70681 19.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2793848Global Dossier 26.06.2019B1
EP2793848 21.10.2015A4
EP2793848 29.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201161577462 19.12.2011
WO2012US70681 19.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1201183 28.08.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201161577462 19.12.2011
WO2012US70681 19.12.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013096485Global Dossier 27.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161577462 19.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE202012013018U 20.08.2014U1
Priority number Date
US201161577462 19.12.2011
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3566691