Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795250

EP2795250 - SENSOR FOR MEASURING SURFACE NON-UNIFORMITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  19.02.2016
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 23.03.2016  [2016/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / QIAO, Yi
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
02 / LAI, Jack W.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
03 / RIBNICK, Evan J.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
04 / HOFELDT, David L.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date12860619.111.12.2012
WO2012US68935
Priority number, dateUS201161578174P20.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161578174 P
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013096003
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795250
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01B11/30, G01N21/86, G01N21/88, G01N21/95, G01N21/89
[2015/37]
Former International [2014/44]G01B11/30, G01N21/86
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:SENSOR ZUR MESSUNG DER UNGLEICHFÖRMIGKEIT VON OBERFLÄCHEN[2014/44]
English:SENSOR FOR MEASURING SURFACE NON-UNIFORMITY[2014/44]
French:CAPTEUR POUR MESURE DE NON-UNIFORMITÉ DE SURFACE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase20.06.2014National basic fee paid 
20.06.2014Search fee paid 
20.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
12.02.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]JP2000180373  (HOYA CORP) [X] 1-5,7,8,10-13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0028] * [I] 6,9,14;
 [XI]US5966212  (HENDLER LAWRENCE [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,7,8,10-13,15 * column 3, line 66 - page 4, line 2; figures 1, 3 * * column 4, line 65 - line 67 * [I] 6,9,14;
 [X]WO2011123485  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]; HOFELDT DAVID L [US]; BROTT ROBERT L) [X] 1,8,13 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036]; figures 2, 4A, 9A * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0077]; claim 15 *;
 [I]US4302105  (SICK ERWIN) [I] 1,8,13 * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 42; figure 1 *;
 [I]GB2147096  (SICK OPTIK ELEKTRONIK ERWIN) [I] 1,8,13 * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 85; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5074668  (FUKAZAWA CHIAKI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US7292333  (FONTAINE NORMAN H [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2009085004  (ROLLING OPTICS AB [SE]; LUNDVALL AXEL [SE]; NIKOLAJEFF FREDRIK [SE]; G) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2006098934  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2008157623  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]; CARLSON DANIEL H [US]; EHNES DALE L) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[X]WO2011123485  (3M INOVATIVE PROPERTIES COMPANY);
 [A]US7292333  (FONTAINE ET AL.);
 [A]WO2009085004  (ROLLING OPTICS AB);
 [A]WO2006098934  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES COMPANY);
 [A]WO2008157623  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES COMPANY)