Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795568

EP2795568 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PATIENT IDENTIFICATION IN A REMOTE MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KPR U.S., LLC
777 West Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[2018/07]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WIESNER, Joel, D.
1110 Treeshade Avenue
St. Peters, MO 63376 / US
02 / GAINES, Robert, B.
1010 Marions Cove Drive
Lake Saint Louis, MO 63367 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Gray, James
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[2017/29]
Former [2014/44]Gray, James
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
Application number, filing date12860719.911.12.2012
[2017/29]
WO2012US68895
Priority number, dateUS20111333444722.12.2011         Original published format: US201113334447
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013095991
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795568
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2795568
Date:19.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06Q50/22, H04W40/02, H04W88/04, // H04W24/00
[2017/06]
Former International [2014/44]G06Q50/22
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR PATIENTENIDENTIFIKATION IN EINEM FERNÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM[2014/44]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PATIENT IDENTIFICATION IN A REMOTE MONITORING SYSTEM[2014/44]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION DE PATIENT DANS SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE À DISTANCE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase23.06.2014National basic fee paid 
23.06.2014Search fee paid 
23.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
04.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2017Fee for grant paid
05.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.02.2017
Opposition(s)20.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.12.2012
AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
IE11.12.2017
LU11.12.2017
MT11.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
IE11.12.2017
LU11.12.2017
MT11.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/52]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
IE11.12.2017
LU11.12.2017
MT11.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/50]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
IE11.12.2017
LU11.12.2017
MT11.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/45]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
IE11.12.2017
LU11.12.2017
MT11.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
LU11.12.2017
MT11.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/24]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US2011161111  (DICKS KENT E [US], et al) [X] 1-31 * abstract * * paragraphs [41]-[47],[53],[60],[67]-[68], [80]-[83],[133];; figures 1,2,6 *;
 [A]WO2009032134  (CARDIAC PACEMAKERS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * abstract * * paragraphs [83], [117]-[118], [145];; figures 1B, 2A; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]US2008222711  (MICHAELIS OLIVER [US]) [A] 1-31 * abstract * * paragraphs [30]-[32],[70] *;
 [A]US2002178126  (BECK TIMOTHY L [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * abstract * * paragraph [43], [51],[55]-[75];; figure 3; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]US2010315225  (TEAGUE EDWARD HARRISON [US]) [A] 1-31 * abstract * * paragraphs [4]-[5],[28]-[29];; figures 2,3,5; claims 1-8 *;
 [A]US7294105  (ISLAM MOHAMMED N [US]) [A] 1-31 * abstract * * figure 6; claims 1-5 *
International search[X]US2011161111  (DICKS KENT E [US], et al);
 [Y]WO2009032134  (CARDIAC PACEMAKERS INC [US], et al);
 [Y]KR20090122968  (QUALCOMM INC [US]);
 [A]US7294105  (ISLAM MOHAMMED N [US]);
 [A]WO2008052034  (MEDAPPS INC [US], et al)
by applicantUS2011161111