Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795418

EP2795418 - PRESSURE REGULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/44]HYDROGEN-GENERATING FUEL CELL CARTRIDGES
[2018/14]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intelligent Energy Limited
Charnwood Building
Holywell Park
Ashby Road
Loughborough
Leicestershire LE11 3GB / GB
[2018/35]
Former [2015/26]For all designated states
Intelligent Energy Limited
Charnwood Building
Holywell Park
Ashby Road
Loughborough
Leicestershire LE11 3GB / GB
For all designated states
Curello, Andrew, J.
15 Eramo Terrace
Hamden, CT 06518 / US
For all designated states
Spahr, Paul
66 Ivy Wayid50000043897620 IB/306 null
Durham, CT 06422 / US
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Société BIC
14, rue Jeanne d'Asnières
92611 Clichy Cedex / FR
For all designated states
Curello, Andrew, J.
15 Eramo Terrace
Hamden, CT 06518 / US
For all designated states
Spahr, Paul
66 Ivy Wayid50000043897620 IB/306 null
Durham, CT 06422 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CURELLO, Andrew, J.
15 Eramo Terrace
Hamden, CT 06518 / US
02 / SPAHR, Paul
66 Ivy Way
Durham, CT 06422 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Creation IP Ltd
Hillington Park Innovation Centre
1 Ainslie Road
Glasgow G52 4RU / GB
[2018/36]
Former [2014/44]Verscht, Thomas Kurt Albert
Josephsburgstrasse 88 A
81673 München / DE
Application number, filing date12860749.618.12.2012
[2018/36]
WO2012IB03104
Priority number, dateUS20111333676523.12.2011         Original published format: US201113336765
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013093646
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795418
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2795418
Date:05.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/04, C01B3/06, H01M8/06, H01M8/065, H01M8/04089, F16K31/126, F16K7/17, // H01M8/04082
[2018/14]
Former International [2015/38]H01M8/04, C01B3/06, H01M8/06
Former International [2014/44]G05D16/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRUCKREGLER[2018/14]
English:PRESSURE REGULATOR[2018/14]
French:RÉGULATEUR DE PRESSION[2018/14]
Former [2014/44]BRENNSTOFFZELLENKARTUSCHEN ZUR WASSERSTOFFERZEUGUNG
Former [2014/44]HYDROGEN-GENERATING FUEL CELL CARTRIDGES
Former [2014/44]CARTOUCHES DE PILES À COMBUSTIBLE PRODUISANT DE L'HYDROGÈNE
Entry into regional phase23.07.2014National basic fee paid 
23.07.2014Search fee paid 
23.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
02.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
30.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2018Fee for grant paid
25.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.02.2017
Opposition(s)06.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
MC05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SI05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IE18.12.2018
LU18.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
[2019/49]
Former [2019/48]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
MC05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SI05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IE18.12.2018
LU18.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/40]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
MC05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SI05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
LU18.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/39]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SI05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
LU18.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/37]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SI05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
NO05.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT05.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[XD]US2006174952  (CURELLO ANDREW J [US], et al) [XD] 1-13 * claims 21-45 * * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0021] , [0070] - [0073] - [0 76] - [0078] - [0 82] , [0 90] - [0093] *;
 [X]US2011189574  (CURELLO ANDREW J [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * claims 1,6,11 * * figures 9-12 * * paragraphs [0073] - [0095] *
International search[X]US2006174952  (CURELLO ANDREW J [US] ET AL);
 [X]US2011189574  (CURELLO ANDREW J [US] ET AL)
by applicantUS5992008
 US5945231
 US4261956
 US2011189574
 US5364977
 US6512005
 US2003077493
 US6554877
 US6562497
 US6758871
 US6773470
 US2002076602
 US2003096150
 US2005074643
 US2005266281
 US2005022883
 US2005118468
 US6683025
 US5804329
    - "Here Come the Microengines", THE INDUSTRIAL PHYSICIST, (200112), pages 20 - 25
 US20050689572
 US20050066573
 US20030356793