Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2794409

EP2794409 - LINER-BASED SHIPPING AND DISPENSING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.04.2017  [2017/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Advanced Technology Materials, Inc.
7 Commerce Drive
Danbury, CT 06810 / US
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / TOM, Glenn
8646 Woodcliff Circle
Bloomington, Minnesota 55438 / US
02 / NELSON, Greg
1701 East 57th Street
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55417 / US
03 / LIU, Wei
17557 George Moran Drive
Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55347 / US
04 / KOLAND, Amy
12759 Sandy Point Drive
Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55347 / US
05 / WARE, Don
3920 Chestnut Drive
Woodbury, Minnesota 55125 / US
06 / BOTET, Alfredo Daniel
27 Fenwick Drive
Avon, Connecticut 06001 / US
07 / HODGES, Jordan Henery
1416 Colorad Bend Drive
Cedar Park, Texas 78613 / US
08 / BRUNELLA, Eric J.
7546 Grenlock Drive
Sylvania, Ohio 43560 / US
09 / ROUSH ORTEGA, Chantel
28940 Main Street
Millbury, Ohio 43447 / US
10 / DURHAM, Daniel J.
2231 Pemberton Drive
Toledo, Ohio 43606 / US
11 / MOMANY, Tracy M.
4221 Butternut Court
Sylvania, Ohio 43560 / US
12 / CARROS, Thomas J.
7010 Dunn Drive
Holland, Ohio 43528 / US
 [2015/13]
Former [2014/44]01 / TOM, Glenn
8646 Woodcliff Circle
Bloomington, Minnesota 55438 / US
02 / NELSON, Greg
1701 East 57th Street
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55417 / US
03 / LIU, Wei
17557 George Moran Drive
Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55347 / US
04 / KOLAND, Amy
12759 Sandy Point Drive
Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55347 / US
05 / WARE, Don
3920 Chestnut Drive
Woodbury, Minnesota 55125 / US
06 / BOTET, Alfredo Daniel
27 Fenwick Drive
Avon, Connecticut 06001 / US
07 / HODGES, Jordan Henery
1416 Colorad Bend Drive
Cedar Park, Texas 78613 / US
08 / BRUNELLA, Eric J.
2143 Stirrup Drive
Temperance, Michigan 48182 / US
09 / ROUSH, Chantel
421 Whitlock Avenue
Toledo, Ohio 43605 / US
10 / DURHAM, Daniel J.
2231 Pemberton Drive
Toledo, Ohio 43606 / US
11 / MOMANY, Tracy M.
4221 Butternut Court
Sylvania, Ohio 43560 / US
12 / CARROS, Thomas J.
7010 Dunn Drive
Holland, Ohio 43528 / US
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB
Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Geyer, Fehners & Partner
Patentanwälte Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date12860950.020.12.2012
WO2012US70866
Priority number, dateUS201161578683P21.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161578683 P
US201261591393P27.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261591393 P
US201261605011P29.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261605011 P
US201261667723P03.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261667723 P
US201261703996P21.09.2012         Original published format: US 201261703996 P
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013096579
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2794409
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:B65D25/16, B65D77/06, B29C49/02
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:ABGABESYSTEME MIT EINEM FUTTER[2014/44]
English:LINER-BASED SHIPPING AND DISPENSING SYSTEMS[2014/44]
French:SYSTÈMES D'EMBALLAGE ET DE DISTRIBUTION BASÉS SUR UN CHEMISAGE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Search fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
05.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/17]
06.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2009088285  (DISPENSING TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * page 1 * * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 2; figures 1-20 *;
 [Y]US2009057347  (LEYS JOHN A [US], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 110] - [0114] *;
 [Y]US2009297769  (YAN HONGWEI [US], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 81] *
International search[X]WO2009088285  (DISPENSING TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL], et al);
 [Y]US2011210148  (NELSON GREGORY C [US], et al);
 [Y]US4560069  (SIMON B KENNETH [US]);
 [Y]US5875921  (OSGAR MICHAEL L [US], et al);
 [A]US2011226806  (O'DOUGHERTY KEVIN T [US], et al);
 [A]US2009314798  (HOVINEN MINNA [US], et al)