EP2795607 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND PROGRAM FOR CONTROLLING ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Yoshinaga c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12861002.9 | 17.12.2012 | WO2012JP83178 | Priority number, date | JP20110281949 | 22.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011281949 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013094714 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2795607 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/391, G06F3/14, G09G5/00, G06F3/048 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
G09G5/391 (EP,US);
H04N7/147 (US);
G06F3/1454 (EP,US);
G06T1/00 (US);
G09G5/003 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0407 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0442 (EP,US);
G09G2350/00 (EP,US);
G09G2370/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/44] | G09G5/00, G06F3/048, G09G3/20, G09G5/391 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND PROGRAMM ZUR STEUERUNG EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2014/44] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND PROGRAM FOR CONTROLLING ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2014/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 20.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.01.2022 | 01.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/46] | 11.07.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/46] | 25.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   22.06.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005259144 (ESHKOLI NOAM [IL]) [A] 2-4,6-8 * figures 1,2,6 ** paragraphs [0006] , [0010] , [0011] , [0013] , [0016] , [0017] , [0019] , [0020] , [0064] - [0069] - [0072] *; | [XI]US2009160883 (SONOBE HAJIME [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 3-10 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0048] , [0049] , [0052] - [0057] - [0061] - [0067] - [0079] - [0083] - [0094] - [0102] - [0106] - [0108] * [I] 2-11; | [XI]US2009278871 (LEWIS THOMAS F [US], et al) [X] 1,5,10 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0018] , [0019] , [0023] - [0025] * [I] 2-4,6-9,11 | International search | [A]JP2005109703 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [X]JP2009151172 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2010014979 (SHARP KK) | by applicant | US2009160883 | US2009278871 |