Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799073

EP2799073 - COMPOSITION OF DETECTION AGENTS FOR EPITHELIAL TUMOUR CELLS AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yan, Wenguang
Room 901 Cambridge Apartment
Laodong Road (South)
Xi'an, Shaanxi 710068 / CN
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB
Kronenstraße 30
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[2018/17]
Former [2014/45]Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner
Kronenstraße 30
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date12861189.428.12.2012
[2018/17]
WO2012CN87880
Priority number, dateCN20111044927029.12.2011         Original published format: CN201110449270
[2014/45]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013097771
Date:04.07.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2799073
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2799073
Date:25.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/519, A61K31/505, A61K31/495, A61K31/5415, A61K31/70, A61K31/19, G01N21/78, G01N33/52
[2015/29]
Former International [2014/45]A61K31/519, A61K31/505, A61K31/495, A61K31/5415, A61K31/70, A61K31/19, G01N21/78
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUM NACHWEIS VON WIRKSTOFFEN FÜR EPHITHELIALE TUMORZELLEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/45]
English:COMPOSITION OF DETECTION AGENTS FOR EPITHELIAL TUMOUR CELLS AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR[2014/45]
French:COMPOSITION D'AGENTS DE DÉTECTION POUR DES CELLULES TUMORALES ÉPITHÉLIALES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2014Translation filed 
26.06.2014National basic fee paid 
26.06.2014Search fee paid 
26.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
07.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
28.09.2017Fee for grant paid
28.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.05.2016
Opposition(s)28.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SI25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
LU28.12.2018
[2019/39]
Former [2019/26]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SI25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/03]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
Former [2018/51]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/50]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/49]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/47]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL25.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[XAI]  - TAKEO K ET AL, "Separation of monoclonal antibodies from antihapten antisera by two-dimensional affinity electrophoresis", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, vol. 597, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/0021-9673(92)80133-F, ISSN 0021-9673, (19920424), pages 365 - 376, (19920424), XP026571076 [X] 1,5-7,10 * page 370, table 3; * [A] 2,3,9,11 [I] 4

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9673(92)80133-F
 [AD]  - CANTO MI; SETRAKIAN S; WILLIS J ET AL., "Methylene blue-directed biopsies improve detection intestinal metaplasia and dysplasia in Barrett's esophagus", GASTROINTEST ENDOSC, (2000), vol. 5, page 560, XP055074269 [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5107(00)70290-2
 [A]  - GUELRUD ET AL, "Acetic acid improves identification of remnant islands of Barrett's epithelium after endoscopic therapy", GASTROINTESTINAL ENDOSCOPY, ELSEVIER, NL, (19980601), vol. 47, no. 6, ISSN 0016-5107, pages 512 - 515, XP005689179 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
International search[A]  - ZHAO, X.B. ET AL., "Tumor-selective targeted delivery of genes and antisense oligodeoxyribonucleotides via the folate receptor", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (2004), vol. 56, pages 1193 - 1204, XP055074268

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2004.01.005
 [A]  - CANTO, M. ET AL., "Methylene blue-directed biopsies improve detection of intestinal metaplasia and dysplasia in Barrett's esophagus", GASTROINTESTINAL ENDOSCOPY, (2000), vol. 51, no. 5, pages 560 - 568, XP055074269

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5107(00)70290-2
 [A]  - GUELRUD, M. ET AL., "Acetic acid improves identification of remnant islands of Barrett's epithelium after endoscopic therapy", GASTROINTESTINAL ENDOSCOPY, (1998), vol. 47, no. 6, pages 512 - 515, XP005689179
by applicant   - MASHBERG, A, J. AMER. DENT.ASSOC, (1983), pages 106 - 112
    - CANTO MI; SETRAKIAN S; WILLIS J ET AL., "Methylene blue-directed biopsies improve detection intestinal metaplasia and dysplasia in Barrett's esophagus", GASTROINTEST ENDOSC, (2000), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/S0016-5107(00)70290-2, page 560, XP002740609

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5107(00)70290-2
    - ZHAO XB; LEE RJ, "Tumor-selective targeted delivery of genes and antisen seo ligo deoxyribonuc leo tides via the folate receptor", ADV DRUG DELIV REV, (2004), vol. 56, no. 8, pages 191 - 193
    - REDDY JA; ALLAGADDA VM; LEAMON CP, "Targeting therapeutic and imaging agents to folate receptor positive tumors", CURRENT PHAM BIOTECH, (2005), vol. 6, pages 131 - 150, XP008103084
    - LINK EM; BLOWER PJ; COSTA DC ET AL., "Early detection of melanoma metastases with radioiodinated methylene blue", EUR J NUCLEAR MED, (1998), vol. 25, no. 9, page 1322
    - LEAMON CP; DEPRINCE RB; HENDREN RW, "Folate-mediated drug delivery: effect of alternative conjugation chemistry", DRUG TARGET, (1999), vol. 7, pages 157 - 169, XP002967550
    - LEAMON CP; COOPER SR; HARDEE GE, "Folate-liposome-mediated antisense oligodeoxynucleotide targeting to cancer cells: evaluation in vitro and vivo", BIOCONJUG CHEM, (2003), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1021/bc020089t, pages 738 - 747, XP001170955

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc020089t