Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797724

EP2797724 - IMPROVED INNER LINER BARRIER FROM MULTILAYER THIN FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK, SM
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin
23 place des Carmes-Déchaux
63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
For all designated states
The Texas A&M University System
Mail Stop 3369
College Station, TX 77843-3369 / US
[2018/44]
Former [2017/29]For all designated states
Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin
12 Cours Sablon
63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
For all designated states
The Texas A&M University System
Mail Stop 3369
College Station, TX 77843-3369 / US
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Compagnie Générale des Établissements Michelin
23 rue Breschet
63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
For all designated states
MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A.
Route Louis Braille 10
1763 Granges-Paccot / CH
For all designated states
The Texas A&M University System
Mail Stop 3369
College Station, TX 77843-3369 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GRUNLAN, Jaime C.
902 Hawthorn Street
College Station, Texas 77840 / US
02 / PRIOLO, Morgan A.
3707 Stevens Creek Court
College Station, Texas 77845 / US
03 / BERGMAN, Brian R.
34 Ganibrille Court
Simpsonville, South Carolina 29681 / US
04 / MCHUGH, John J.
6 Parkhaven Way
Greenville, South Carolina 29607 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date12861351.028.12.2012
[2018/27]
WO2012US71903
Priority number, dateUS201161581743P30.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161581743 P
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013101975
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2797724
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2797724
Date:04.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:B60C1/00, B05D7/02, B32B27/20, C08K3/34
[2015/23]
Former International [2014/45]B28B1/00, B28B1/38
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE INNENSPERRSCHICHT AUS EINER MEHRLAGIGEN DÜNNSCHICHT[2014/45]
English:IMPROVED INNER LINER BARRIER FROM MULTILAYER THIN FILM[2014/45]
French:BARRIÈRE DE REVÊTEMENT INTÉRIEURE PERFECTIONNÉE À PARTIR D'UN FILM MINCE MULTICOUCHE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase28.07.2014National basic fee paid 
28.07.2014Search fee paid 
28.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
30.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.05.2018Fee for grant paid
28.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18175017.5  / EP3385093
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2018
Opposition(s)05.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
SM04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/24]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL04.07.2018
AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
NO04.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL04.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004053037  (KOCH CAROL A [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13,15,20 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032] * * example 7 & 16; tables 1,2 *;
 [X]US2005152955  (AKHAVE JAY R [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13,15,20 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0086] *;
 [X]US2008243113  (SHASTRI V PRASAD [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10,20 * paragraph [0126] * * examples 2-4,16 * * claims 16-21 *
International search[X]US2011200825  (CHAKRABORTY SOMA [US], et al);
 [Y]US6232389  (FEENEY CARRIE A [US], et al);
 [A]US2010227070  (GRUNLAN JAIME C [US]);
 [A]US2005001317  (GANAPATHIRAMAN RAMANATH [US], et al);
 [A]US2007259452  (SCHLENOFF JOSEPH B [US]);
 [A]US2010130082  (LEE JUNG AH [US], et al);
 [A]WO2011023587  (BASF SE [DE], et al);
 [A]US2005098252  (MURAOKA KIYOSHIGE [JP], et al)