Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798749

EP2798749 - CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION FEEDBACK APPARATUS AND METHOD IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM OPERATING IN FDD MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.08.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
30.08.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
For all designated states
Korea National University of Transportation Industry Academic Cooperation Foundation
50, Daehang-ro, Cheongju-si
Chungcheongbuk-do 380-702 / KR
[2018/24]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
For all designated states
Korea National University of Transportation Industry Academic Cooperation Foundation
50 Daehakro
Chungju-City
Chungbuk 380-702 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Ki Il
No. 102-1506
Nokwon Maeul Saecheonnyeon Greenville 1 Danji Apt.
Singal-dong
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-907 / KR
02 / KIM, Youn Sun
No. 103-803, Parktown Daelim Apt.
Sunae-dong
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-020 / KR
03 / LEE, Ju Ho
No. 728-1701, Salgugol 7-danji Hyundai Apt.
Yeongtong 2-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-472 / KR
04 / CHO, Joon Young
No. 224-101, Hwanggol Maeul 2-danji Apt.
Yeongtong-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-470 / KR
05 / LEE, Hyo Jin
No. 409, Hansvill Apt.
Yeoksam-dong
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 135-080 / KR
06 / MUN, Cheol
Korea National University of Transportation
50, Daehang-ro
Chungju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 380-702 / KR
 [2018/43]
Former [2014/45]01 / KIM, Ki Il
No. 102-1506
Nokwon Maeul Saecheonnyeon Greenville 1 Danji Apt.
Singal-dong
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-907 / KR
02 / KIM, Youn Sun
No. 103-803 Parktown Daelim Apt.
Sunae-dong
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-020 / KR
03 / LEE, Ju Ho
No. 728-1701 Salgugol 7-danji Hyundai Apt.
Yeongtong 2-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-472 / KR
04 / CHO, Joon Young
No. 224-101 Hwanggol Maeul 2-danji Apt.
Yeongtong-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-470 / KR
05 / LEE, Hyo Jin
No. 409 Hansvill Apt.
Yeoksam-dong
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 135-080 / KR
06 / MUN, Cheol
Korea National University of Transportation
50 Daehang-ro
Chungju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 380-702 / KR
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2018/43]
Former [2014/45]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date12861618.226.12.2012
[2018/43]
WO2012KR11487
Priority number, dateKR2011014363127.12.2011         Original published format: KR 20110143631
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013100579
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798749
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2798749
Date:24.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/04, H04B7/06, H04B7/0417, // H04L5/00, H04L25/02, H04W72/08, H04W16/28
[2018/21]
Former International [2015/35]H04B7/04, H04B7/06, // H04L5/00, H04L25/02, H04W72/08, H04W16/28
Former International [2014/45]H04B7/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KANALSTATUSINFORMATIONS-FEEDBACKVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN IN EINEM IM FDD-MODUS BETRIEBENEN DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2014/45]
English:CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION FEEDBACK APPARATUS AND METHOD IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM OPERATING IN FDD MODE[2014/45]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE RETOUR D'INFORMATIONS D'ÉTAT DE CANAL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL FONCTIONNANT EN MODE FDD[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2014National basic fee paid 
17.06.2014Search fee paid 
17.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
24.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2018Fee for grant paid
14.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.04.2017
Opposition(s)25.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
CZ24.10.2018
DK24.10.2018
EE24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
IT24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
MC24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RO24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
SK24.10.2018
SM24.10.2018
LU26.12.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
[2019/40]
Former [2019/39]AL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
CZ24.10.2018
DK24.10.2018
EE24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
IT24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RO24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
SK24.10.2018
SM24.10.2018
LU26.12.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
Former [2019/37]AL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
CZ24.10.2018
DK24.10.2018
EE24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
IT24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RO24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
SM24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
Former [2019/35]AL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
CZ24.10.2018
DK24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
IT24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
DK24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
IT24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
Former [2019/25]AT24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
NO24.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
NO24.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL24.10.2018
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP1981198  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0008] - [0009] - [0040] - [0060]; figures 2,4,8 * [A] 2,10 [Y] 3-8,11-14;
 [Y]  - PHOENIX YUAN ET AL, "Hybrid Analog/Digital CSI Feedback for Transmit Beamforming Systems in Time-Selective Fading Channels", 2010 IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE (VTC 2010-SPRING) - 16-19 MAY 2010 - TAIPEI, TAIWAN, IEEE, US, (20100516), ISBN 978-1-4244-2518-1, pages 1 - 5, XP031695945 [Y] 3-8,11-14 * Equation 8; page 2 - page 3 *
International search[A]US2010203912  (ASHIKHMIN, ALEXEI ET AL.);
 [A]KR20110014187  (NORTEL NETWORKS LIMITED);
 [A]KR20080074419  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.);
 [A]KR20090027856  (ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE ET AL.)
 [A]  - JUN ZHU, "Performance Evaluation of Low-Complexity Multi-Cell Multi-User MIMO Systems", A THESIS SUBMITTED IN PARTIAL FULFILLMENT OF THE REQUIREMENTS FOR THE DEGREE OF MASTER OF APPLIED SCIENCE, UNIVERSITY OF VICTORIA, (2011), pages I - X, 1 - 81, XP055073640
by applicantEP1981198
    - "Hybrid Analog/Digital CSI feedback for Transmit Beamforming Systems in Time-Selective Fading Channels", PHOENIX YUAN ET AL., 2010 IEEE Vehicular Technology Conference (VTC-2010-Spring, IEEE, (20100516), pages 1 - 5