Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797419

EP2797419 - PEST CONTROL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
27-1 Shinkawa 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8260 / JP
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMADA, Masahiro
c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
2-1 Takatsukasa 4-chome
Takarazuka-shi Hyogo 665-8555 / JP
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12861642.212.12.2012
WO2012JP82852
Priority number, dateJP2011028927528.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011289275
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013099715
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2797419
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:A01P7/04, A01N37/36, A01N25/02, A01N53/00, A01N25/06
[2015/40]
Former International [2014/45]A01N53/06, A01N53/08, A01P7/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:SCHÄDLINGSBEKÄMPFUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2014/45]
English:PEST CONTROL COMPOSITION[2014/45]
French:COMPOSITION DE LUTTE CONTRE LES NUISIBLES[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase21.07.2014National basic fee paid 
21.07.2014Search fee paid 
21.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
05.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/45]
03.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/45]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US2003195119  (MORI ET AL) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO2008123574  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JP2003160418  ;
 [Y]US5591727  (PERYCUT-CHEMIE AG) [Y] 1-5 * claims 1,15,16 *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (20030603), Database accession no. 2003-818766, XP002743655 & JP2003160418 A 20030603 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *
International search[Y]JP2004002363  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED);
 [Y]JP2004168671  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED);
 [Y]JPS5428818  (FUMAKILLA LTD.);
 [XP]JP2012082192  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED)