Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798681

EP2798681 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ORGANIC SOLAR CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.06.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kolon Industries, Inc.
110, Magokdong-ro
Gangseo-gu
Seoul 07793 / KR
[2019/22]
Former [2016/37]For all designated states
Kolon Industries, Inc.
(Byeoryang-dong)
11, Kolon-ro
Gwacheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 13837 / KR
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Kolon Industries, Inc.
Kolon Tower
42 Byeoryangsangga 2-ro
Gwacheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 427-709 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / KAL, Jin Ha
301
353-48 Sindang 2(i)-dong
Jung-gu
Seoul 100-828 / KR
02 / HAN, Jung Seok
210-1002 Park Rio Apt.
Jamsil 4(sa)-dong
Songpa-gu
Seoul 138-931 / KR
03 / OH, Chul
928-7 Bangbae 1(il)-dong
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-843 / KR
04 / KIM, Kwang Su
48-3 Uman 2(i)-dong
Paldal-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-816 / KR
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date12861743.831.05.2012
WO2012KR04293
Priority number, dateKR2011014526128.12.2011         Original published format: KR 20110145261
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013100279
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798681
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L51/48, B08B1/02
[2015/36]
Former International [2014/45]H01L51/48
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ORGANISCHEN SOLARZELLE[2014/45]
English:METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ORGANIC SOLAR CELL[2014/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLULE SOLAIRE ORGANIQUE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase30.04.2014National basic fee paid 
30.04.2014Search fee paid 
30.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
17.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.03.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
27.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[IY]US2005129977  (POON HAK F [US] ET AL) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0026] , [0 28] , [0030] - [0032] - [0 34] , [0036] , [0038] , [0042] , [0044] - [0046] - [0049]; figures 1,4, 5,6,7A, 7B; claim 97 * [Y] 1-10;
 [Y]WO2010004888  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC [JP]; OTANI HIROSHI [JP]; ENDO KIYOSHI [JP) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0095] , [0102] , [0116] , [0117] , [0173] , [0223] , [0224]; figures 4a, 4b, 6a, 6b *;
 [Y]JP2006216253  (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0026] , [0034] , [0040]; figures 1,3,9-12 *;
 [Y]WO03095115  (SUSTAINABLE TECHNOLOGIES INTER [AU]; BERTOZ MICHAEL PETER JOHN [AU]; S) [Y] 11,12 * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 8 * * page 8, line 29 - page 10, line 4; figures 1,2 * * page 1, line 17 * * page 4, line 1 *;
 [Y]JP2007280621  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 11,12 * paragraphs [0007] , [0023] , [0025] , [0027]; figure 1 *
International search[A]US2011260152  (NAKAYAMA TOMOYUKI ET AL.);
 [A]US2005257741  (SHUNPEI YAMAZAKI);
 [A]US2004115339  (NOBUYUKI ITO)
 [A]  - F.C. KREBS ET AL., "UPSCALING OF POLYMER SOLAR CELL FABRICATION USING FULL ROLL-T o-roll processing", NANOSCALE, (20100504), vol. 2, no. 6, pages 873 - 886, XP055022935

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b9nr00430k
 [A]  - F.C.KREBS ET AL., "A complete process for production of flexible large area polymer solar cells entirely using screen printing-first public demonstratio n", SOLAR ENERGY MATERIALS & SOLAR CELLS, (20090120), vol. 93, no. 4, pages 422 - 441, XP025962300

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.solmat.2008.12.001