Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799311

EP2799311 - STRUCTURE FOR SIDE PORTION OF VEHICLE BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / NAGAI, Shigeyuki
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
02 / KITAYAMA, Kenichi
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
03 / WATANABE, Yasunori
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[2016/30]
Former [2014/45]Herzog, Markus , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Postfach 860820
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date12861841.013.11.2012
[2016/30]
WO2012JP79347
Priority number, dateJP2011028908128.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011289081
[2014/45]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013099456
Date:04.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2799311
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2799311
Date:27.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:B62D25/04, B62D25/06, B62D27/02, B60R13/06
[2016/10]
Former International [2015/42]B62D25/04, B60J10/08, B60R13/06, B62D25/06, B62D27/02
Former International [2014/45]B62D25/04, B60J10/08, B60R13/06, B62D25/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STRUKTUR FÜR EIN SEITENTEIL EINES FAHRZEUGKÖRPERS[2014/45]
English:STRUCTURE FOR SIDE PORTION OF VEHICLE BODY[2014/45]
French:STRUCTURE DESTINÉE À UNE PARTIE LATÉRALE DE CARROSSERIE DE VÉHICULE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase22.07.2014Translation filed 
22.07.2014National basic fee paid 
22.07.2014Search fee paid 
22.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
29.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2016Fee for grant paid
16.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.02.2016
Opposition(s)02.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.11.2012
AL27.07.2016
AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CY27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
MK27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
TR27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
GB13.11.2016
IE13.11.2016
MT13.11.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU13.11.2012
AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CY27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
MK27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
TR27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
GB13.11.2016
IE13.11.2016
MT13.11.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/43]HU13.11.2012
AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CY27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
MK27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
GB13.11.2016
IE13.11.2016
MT13.11.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/30]HU13.11.2012
AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CY27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
MK27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
GB13.11.2016
IE13.11.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/51]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
GB13.11.2016
IE13.11.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/50]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IE13.11.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/43]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
Former [2017/35]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
Former [2017/32]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/13]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT27.07.2016
BE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/10]BE27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RS27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
NO27.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
NO27.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT27.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US2011233970  (NAGAI SHIGEYUKI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0066] - [0089]; figures 1-12 *;
 [A]JP2011240887  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH08108864  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-12 *;
 [A]US2006138807  (HASEGAWA YOSHIHARU [JP] ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2690404  (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[A]JP2001322506  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.);
 [A]JPH11348821  (FUJI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD.);
 [A]JPS4921227B  (NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [A]JPS60178282U  (SUZUKI MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [A]JPH11227632  (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2011195107
 JP2011088494