Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2799311 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2799311



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 185
31.05.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
28.07.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
30.06.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.06.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
16.06.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
16.06.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
04.03.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 4
17.02.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.02.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.02.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.02.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
30.11.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
23.10.2015 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
02.10.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
29.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
29.09.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
29.09.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
29.09.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
15.09.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.09.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
15.09.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
26.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
26.03.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.03.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
24.03.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
11.02.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
11.09.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
10.09.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
09.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.07.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
22.07.2014 Description Search / examination 15
22.07.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 Drawings Search / examination 8
22.07.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
17.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
17.07.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
09.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
25.02.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
24.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
04.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
04.07.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
04.07.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 24