Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2799311 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280062941 EP12861841



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8960775Global Dossier 24.02.2015B2
US2014354012 04.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2011289081 28.12.2011
WO2012JP79347 13.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5734461BGlobal Dossier 17.06.2015B2
JPWO2013099456 30.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
JP2013551526 13.11.2012
JP2011289081 28.12.2011
WO2012JP79347 13.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103998327BGlobal Dossier 06.01.2016B
CN103998327 20.08.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2011289081 28.12.2011
WO2012JP79347 13.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2799311Global Dossier 27.07.2016B1
EP2799311 14.10.2015A4
EP2799311 05.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2011289081 28.12.2011
WO2012JP79347 13.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014016156 04.07.2017A8
BR112014016156 13.06.2017A2
Priority number Date
JP2011289081 28.12.2011
WO2012JP79347 13.11.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013099456Global Dossier 04.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2011289081 28.12.2011