Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800222

EP2800222 - VEHICLE CHARGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.06.2017  [2017/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / KOYAMA, Takeshi
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki
2-1 Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP
02 / IWATA, Yasuki
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki
2-1 Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP
03 / ASANO, Toshiyuki
c/o Nitto Kogyo Corporation
2201 Kanihara
Nagakute-shi Aichi 480-1189 / JP
04 / HAYASHI, Satoru
c/o Nitto Kogyo Corporation
2201 Kanihara
Nagakute-shi Aichi 480-1189 / JP
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date12861948.325.12.2012
WO2012JP83476
Priority number, dateJP2011028738428.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011287384
JP2012026707106.12.2012         Original published format: JP 2012267071
[2014/45]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013099868
Date:04.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800222
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:H02J3/00, B60L11/18, H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H02J7/00, H02J7/02
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUGLADESYSTEM[2014/45]
English:VEHICLE CHARGING SYSTEM[2014/45]
French:SYSTÈME DE CHARGEMENT DE VÉHICULES[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2014Translation filed 
03.07.2014National basic fee paid 
03.07.2014Search fee paid 
03.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
03.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/26]
24.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2011140659  (SUZUKI N) [Y] 1-8 * column 0009 - column 0012; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]EP2219278  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [Y]JP2011211891  (CHUGOKU ELECTRIC POWER) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0006] , [0044]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP2388884  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0037] , [0101] , [0124]; figures 1,29 *;
 [AP]EP2426004  (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP]) [AP] 1-8 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0029]; figure 1 *
International search[A]JPH0315232  (NIPPON YUSOKI CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2010110173  (HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2011125178  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.)
by applicantJP2001069678