Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800292

EP2800292 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FEEDBACK INFORMATION TRANSMISSION BASED ON ENHANCED PHICH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.03.2019
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.03.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
China Academy of Telecommunications Technology
No. 40 Xueyuan Rd.
Haidian District
Beijing 100191 / CN
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHAO, Rui
No. 40 Xueyuan Rd.
Haidan District Beijing 100191 / CN
02 / PAN, Xueming
No. 40 Xueyuan Rd.
Haidan District Beijing 100191 / CN
03 / SHEN, Zukang
No. 40 Xueyuan Rd.
Haidan District Beijing 100191 / CN
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Nony
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Nony
3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date12862529.020.09.2012
WO2012CN81698
Priority number, dateCN20111045253729.12.2011         Original published format: CN201110452537
[2014/45]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013097497
Date:04.07.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800292
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/16, H04L1/00, H04L1/18, // H04L5/00, H04L27/26, H04W88/08, H04W72/04
[2019/14]
Former International [2015/31]H04L1/16, H04L1/00, H04L1/18, // H04L5/00
Former International [2014/45]H04L1/16, H04L1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON FEEDBACKINFORMATIONEN AUF DER BASIS VON ERWEITERTEM PHICH[2014/45]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FEEDBACK INFORMATION TRANSMISSION BASED ON ENHANCED PHICH[2014/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE RETOUR BASÉS SUR UN PHICH AMÉLIORÉ[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2014Translation filed 
27.06.2014National basic fee paid 
27.06.2014Search fee paid 
27.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
18.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
24.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.05.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
30.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]CN102202400  (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 US2014133365  [ ] (PENG YING [CN], et al) [ ] * figures 6-9 * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0096] *;
 [A]CA2780390  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[XP]CN102546134  (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH);
 [Y]CN101527623  (ZTE CORP);
 [Y]CN102202400  (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH);
 [A]CN102076094  (BEIJING SAMSUNG COMM TECH RES, et al)