Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798447

EP2798447 - TOUCH-SCROLLING PAD FOR COMPUTER INPUT DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/20]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KUJAWSKI, Christopher, H.
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / TORRENCE, Anthony, A.
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / CHUNG, Yuan-Chou
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / PICCIOTTO, Carl, E.
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
05 / SCHWEERS, Michael, R.
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
06 / PEDERSEN, Matthew, G.
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
07 / SARMIENTO, Nino, Aldrin, L.
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
08 / JACKSON, Martyn, S.
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
09 / MAIL, Scott, Mitchel
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date12862789.013.12.2012
WO2012US69329
Priority number, dateUS20111333847228.12.2011         Original published format: US201113338472
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013101472
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798447
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/03, G06F3/041, G06F3/01, G06F3/038, G06F3/0485, G06F3/0354, G06F3/0338
[2015/28]
Former International [2014/45]G06F3/03, G06F3/041, G06F3/01
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:TOUCH-SCROLL-PAD FÜR COMPUTEREINGABEVORRICHTUNGEN[2014/45]
English:TOUCH-SCROLLING PAD FOR COMPUTER INPUT DEVICES[2014/45]
French:PAVÉ DE DÉFILEMENT TACTILE POUR DISPOSITIFS D'ENTRÉE D'ORDINATEUR[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2014National basic fee paid 
22.05.2014Search fee paid 
22.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
15.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010027854  (CHATTERJEE MANJIRNATH [US] ET AL) [X] 1,5,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0040] - [0043] - [0047] , [0051] , [0056] , [0059] - [0061] - [0068] , [0069] , [0072] - [0077] - [0082] - [0088] *;
 [X]US2006119586  (GRANT DANNY A [CA] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,5,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0050] , [0051] , [0054] , [0070] - [0072] - [0076] , [0079] , [0083] , [0085] , [0094] , [0096] , [0099] , [0103] *;
 [A]US2004046741  (LOW WING KONG [US] ET AL) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0036] , [0038] , [0040] *
International search[X]US2010079404  (DEGNER, BRETT WILLIAM ET AL.);
 [Y]US2006119586  (GRANT, DANNY A.);
 [A]US2010245258  (STEWART, AARON MICHAEL ET AL.);
 [A]US2006274042  (KRAH, CHRISTOPH H. ET AL.);
 [A]US2011109552  (YASUTAKE, TAIZO)
by applicantUS2010027845
 US2006119586
 US2004046741