Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799880

EP2799880 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING HEMOSTATIC FUNCTION USING BLOOD MOBILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.04.2017  [2017/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Korea University Research and Business Foundation
Anam-dong-5-ga 1
Seongbuk-gu
Seoul 136-713 / KR
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / LIM, Chae Seung
302-804 Kunyoung-3-danji Apt.
399-6 Pyeongchon-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-070 / KR
02 / SHIN, Se Hyun
112-1404 Ba-Dong
SinSamho Apt.
Bangbae-dong
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-060 / KR
03 / KIM, Kyoeng A
1-1 325-2 Susaek-dong
Eunpyeong-gu
Seoul 122-876 / KR
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12862839.326.12.2012
WO2012KR11426
Priority number, dateKR2011014324227.12.2011         Original published format: KR 20110143242
[2014/45]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013100536
Date:04.07.2013
Language:KO
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2799880
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/86, G01N35/08, G01N33/49
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG EINER HÄMOSTASEFUNKTION MITHILFE DER BLUTMOBILITÄT[2014/45]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING HEMOSTATIC FUNCTION USING BLOOD MOBILITY[2014/45]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE LA FONCTION HÉMOSTATIQUE EN UTILISANT LA MOBILITÉ DU SANG[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2014Translation filed 
03.07.2014National basic fee paid 
03.07.2014Search fee paid 
03.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
20.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/15]
06.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/15]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO0250534  (INVERNESS MEDICAL LTD [GB]; RICHTER TANJA [GB]; ALLEN JOHN [US]; MCALE) [X] 1,2,5,7-9,12,13 * page 1, paragraph 1; figure 5; claims 1-15 * * page 6, lines 12-14, 27-35 * * page 7, lines 6-9, 12-13,24-26 * * page 10, paragraph 1 * * page 12, lines 18-22 * * page 13, paragraph 1 * * page 22, lines 23-27 * [I] 3,4,6,10,11;
 [XAI]US2006269978  (HAWORTH WILLIAM S [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5,7-9 * paragraphs [0081] , [0087] , [ 0092] , [0118]; figures 1-5; claims 25, 36,37,50, 52-54 * [A] 12,13 [I] 4,6;
 [XI]US2011244595  (CHUNG CHEN-KUEI [TW] ET AL) [X] 1,5 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013]; figures 1, 2; claims 1-13 * [I] 12,13
International search[X]JP2008185564  (FUJIMORI KOGYO CO LTD);
 [Y]KR20100027389  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.);
 [A]US5140161  (HILLMAN, R. S. ET AL.);
 [A]WO9414050  (INTERNATIONAL TECHNIDYNE CORPORATION)