Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800411

EP2800411 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING MAXIMUM NUMBER OF ACCESSES FOR WLAN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/45]WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING MAXIMUM ACCESS QUANTITY
[2018/17]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SK
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2018/42]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / FANG, Xia
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / ZUO, Yanqiang
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / LIU, Wei
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date12862859.121.06.2012
[2018/42]
WO2012CN77377
Priority number, dateCN20111044377927.12.2011         Original published format: CN201110443779
[2014/45]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013097427
Date:04.07.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800411
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2800411
Date:17.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/08, H04W48/06, H04W84/12, H04W28/22, H04W28/02
[2015/34]
Former International [2014/45]H04W24/08, H04W48/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER MAXIMALEN NUTZERMENGE FÜR WLAN ZUGANG[2018/17]
English:WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING MAXIMUM NUMBER OF ACCESSES FOR WLAN[2018/17]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET MÉTHODE DE RÉGLAGE DU NOMBRE MAXIMAL DES ACCÈS POUR WLAN[2018/17]
Former [2014/45]DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER MAXIMALEN ZUGANGSQUANTITÄT
Former [2014/45]WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING MAXIMUM ACCESS QUANTITY
Former [2014/45]DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET MÉTHODE DE RÉGLAGE DU VOLUME MAXIMAL D'ACCÈS
Entry into regional phase24.07.2014Translation filed 
24.07.2014National basic fee paid 
24.07.2014Search fee paid 
24.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
15.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2018Fee for grant paid
04.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.09.2017
Opposition(s)18.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
29.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
EE17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RO17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
SK17.10.2018
SM17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
[2019/40]
Former [2019/37]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
EE17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RO17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
SM17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/35]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/25]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
NO17.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL17.10.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]US2011117906  (HOSONO HIROYUKI [JP]) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0811] , [0023] - [0044] *;
 [A]US2010103831  (CALDWELL CHRISTOPHER E [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0029] - [0038] - [0041] , [0044] , [0046] *;
 [A]US2011103230  (IYER PRADEEP J [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0013] , [0015] , [0017] *
International search[A]CN101765114  (HANGZHOU H3C TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.);
 [A]CN102164077  (SHENZHEN TENDA TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.);
 [A]CN102238646  (MICROTEK INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT (SHANGHAI) CO., LTD. ET AL.);
 [A]JP2004048152  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO., LTD.)