Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797527

EP2797527 - OCCIPITO-CERVICAL FIXATION ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR CONSTRUCTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.02.2017  [2017/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Blackstone Medical, Inc.
3451 Plano Parkway
Lewisville, Texas 75056 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / ZIOLO, Tara
43 Twin Oaks Trail
Hewitt, New Jersey 07421 / US
02 / TERMYNA, Stephen
829 Knoll Road
Boonton, New Jersey 07005 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham
B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date12862930.028.12.2012
WO2012US72107
Priority number, dateUS20111334158730.12.2011         Original published format: US201113341587
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013102103
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2797527
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/70, A61B17/88
[2016/04]
Former International [2014/45]A61B17/70
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:OKZIPITOZERVIKALE FIXIERANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2014/45]
English:OCCIPITO-CERVICAL FIXATION ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR CONSTRUCTING SAME[2014/45]
French:ENSEMBLE DE FIXATION OCCIPITO-CERVICAL ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE CONSTRUCTION[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase04.07.2014National basic fee paid 
04.07.2014Search fee paid 
04.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
06.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/06]
20.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2011190824  (GEPHART MATTHEW P [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9,13,16 * paragraphs [0088] , [ 109]; figures 16,17 * * paragraphs [0098] , [ 112]; figures 14, 19 * [Y] 10-12,14,15 [I] 7,17;
 [YA]US2009270924  (WING CHARLES A [US], et al) [Y] 11,12,15 * paragraph [0042]; figures 1a,2 * * paragraphs [0039] - [0040] - [0043]; figure 4 * [A] 1-7,9,16;
 [I]US2010222779  (ZIEMEK TERRY [US], et al) [I] 1-9,11-13,16 * paragraphs [0041] - [0048]; figures 3,4,5 *;
 [A]US2008177313  (LEMOINE JEREMY J [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0059]; figures 14,14a,14b *;
 [Y]WO2008016955  (WARSAW ORTHOPEDIC INC [US], et al) [Y] 10,14 * page 2, line 22 - page 9, line 22; figures 2,2a,2b *
International search[Y]US2011190824  (GEPHART MATTHEW P [US], et al);
 [Y]US2009270924  (WING CHARLES A [US], et al);
 [Y]US2010222779  (ZIEMEK TERRY [US], et al);
 [Y]US2003130661  (OSMAN SAID G [US]);
 [A]US2008125781  (HOFFMAN ZACHARY M [US], et al)