blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2797527
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8876872Global Dossier 04.11.2014B2
US2014046375 13.02.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201113341587 30.12.2011
US201314053390 14.10.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2015504731Global Dossier 16.02.2015A
Priority number Date
US201113341587 30.12.2011
WO2012US72107 28.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2797527Global Dossier 27.01.2016A4
EP2797527 05.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201113341587 30.12.2011
WO2012US72107 28.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2012362197 24.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201113341587 30.12.2011
WO2012US72107 28.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2017228540B 22.11.2018B2
AU2017228540 05.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
AU2017228540 12.09.2017
US201113341587 30.12.2011
WO2012US72107 28.12.2012
AU2012362197 28.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2019201239 14.03.2019A1
Priority number Date
AU2017228540 12.09.2017
US201113341587 30.12.2011
WO2012US72107 28.12.2012
AU2019201239 22.02.2019
AU2012362197 28.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014016292 13.06.2017A2
Priority number Date
US201113341587 30.12.2011
WO2012US72107 28.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2862118 04.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113341587 30.12.2011
WO2012US72107 28.12.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013102103Global Dossier 04.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113341587 30.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US8556942Global Dossier 15.10.2013B2
US2013172938 04.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113341587 30.12.2011