Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799458

EP2799458 - FLUORINE-CONTAINING COMPOSITION AND FLUORINE-CONTAINING POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 12.06.2019 [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / MINAMI, Shinichi
DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
02 / FUKUMORI, Masaki
DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
03 / UEHARA, Tetsuya
DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
04 / NAKAMURA, Hisako
DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
05 / YAMAMOTO, Ikuo
DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date12863128.012.12.2012
[2019/24]
WO2012JP82220
Priority number, dateJP2011028808028.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011288080
[2014/45]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013099611
Date:04.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2799458
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2799458
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:C08F220/24, C08L33/16, C09K3/18, D06M15/277
[2015/33]
Former International [2014/45]C08F220/22, C08L33/16, C09K3/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLUORHALTIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FLUORHALTIGES POLYMER[2014/45]
English:FLUORINE-CONTAINING COMPOSITION AND FLUORINE-CONTAINING POLYMER[2014/45]
French:COMPOSITION ET POLYMÈRE CONTENANT DU FLUOR[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase24.07.2014Translation filed 
24.07.2014National basic fee paid 
24.07.2014Search fee paid 
24.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
25.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
19.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2019Fee for grant paid
26.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
14.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2011062292  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * examples 1-3 *;
 [IY]EP1690909  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [I] 1-6,10-14 * examples 8,9; table 1 * * paragraph [0022] * * example 1 * [Y] 7-9;
 [Y]WO2010030044  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 7-9 * Preparative example 3 *;
 [IY]EP2172530  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-14 * example 4; table 3 * * paragraphs [0045] , [0046] * [Y] 1-14;
 [Y]JP2770387B  (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 1-14 * page 6; example 3 *
International search[A]WO2009008514  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [A]JPS6399285  (DAIKIN IND LTD);
 [A]WO2011122442  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al);
 [A]JPH01315471  (DAIKIN IND LTD)
by applicantUS5247008
 WO2010030044
 WO2011122442
    - MAEKAWA TAKASHIGE, FINE CHEMICAL, (1994), vol. 23, no. 6, page 12
    - "PRELIMINARY RISK ASSESSMENT OF THE DEVELOPMENTAL TOXICITY ASSOCIATED WITH EXPOSURE TO PERFLUOROOCTANOIC ACID AND ITS SALTS", EPA REPORT, URL: http://www.epa.gov/opptintr/pfoa/pfoara.pdf
    - FEDERAL REGISTER, vol. 68, no. 73, (20030416), URL: http://www.epa.gov/opptintr/pfoa/pfoafr.pdf
    - "EPA INTENSIFIES SCIENTIFIC INVESTIGATION OF A CHEMICAL PROCESSING AID", EPA ENVIRONMENTAL NEWS FOR RELEASE, (200304), URL: http://www.epa.gov/opptintr/pfoa/pfoaprs.pdf
    - EPA OPPT FACT SHEET, (20030414), URL: http://www.epa.gov/opptintr/pfoa/pfoafacts.pdf