Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800108

EP2800108 - SINTERED NEODYMIUM MAGNET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.10.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INTERMETALLICS CO., LTD.
1642-144, Nasubigawa
Nakatsugawa-shi
Gifu 509-9132 / JP
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / SAGAWA, Masato
c/o INTERMETALLICS CO. LTD.
1-36 Goryo Ohara
Nishikyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8245 / JP
02 / MIZOGUCHI, Tetsuhiko
c/o INTERMETALLICS CO. LTD.
1-36 Goryo Ohara
Nishikyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8245 / JP
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[2018/15]
Former [2014/45]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date12863318.727.12.2012
[2018/15]
WO2012JP83788
Priority number, dateJP2011028686427.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011286864
JP2012002671909.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012026719
[2014/45]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013100010
Date:04.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800108
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2800108
Date:11.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01F1/08, B22F1/00, B22F3/00, C22C33/02, H01F1/057, H01F41/02
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:GESINTERTER NEODYM-MAGNET[2014/45]
English:SINTERED NEODYMIUM MAGNET[2014/45]
French:AIMANT AU NÉODYME FRITTÉ[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase31.10.2013Translation filed 
31.10.2013National basic fee paid 
31.10.2013Search fee paid 
31.10.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/45]
13.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2018Fee for grant paid
27.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.07.2016
Opposition(s)14.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
19.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
LU27.12.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/39]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
LU27.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL11.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2169689  (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5 * figure 1; example 2 * [I] 3,4;
 [XDI]WO2010109760  (HITACHI LTD [JP]; KOMURO MATAHIRO [JP]; SATSU YUICHI [JP]; SUZUKI HIRO) [XD] 1,2 * figure 6; example 7 * [I] 3-5;
 [P]US2012025651  (KOMURO MATAHIRO [JP] ET AL);
 [I]EP2239747  (INTERMETALLICS CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-5 * example 2 *;
 [A]  - SEPEHRI-AMIN H ET AL, "Grain boundary structure and chemistry of Dy-diffusion processed Nd-Fe-B sintered magnets", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (20100514), vol. 107, no. 9, doi:10.1063/1.3351247, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 9A745 - 9A745, XP012134249 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3351247
International search[Y]WO2011004894  (INTERMETALLICS CO., LTD.);
 [Y]WO2007088718  (HITACHI METALS, LTD.);
 [Y]WO2009004794  (HITACHI METALS, LTD.);
 [A]WO2010109760  (HITACHI, LTD.)
ExaminationUS2008241513
by applicantWO2006043348
 WO2011004894