Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800045

EP2800045 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PUBLISHING PROMOTIONAL CONTENTS AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.12.2015
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.12.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.01.2016  [2016/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited
Room 403 East 2 Block SEG Park
Zhenxing Rd.
Futian District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518044 / CN
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / LING, Guo
Room 403
East Block 2
SEG Park
Zhenxing Road, Futian
Shenzhen Guangdong 518044 / CN
02 / GUO, Yang
Room 403
East Block 2
SEG Park
Zhenxing Road, Futian
Shenzhen Guangdong 518044 / CN
03 / YANG, Ganrong
Room 403
East Block 2
SEG Park
Zhenxing Road, Futian
Shenzhen Guangdong 518044 / CN
04 / ZHAO, Yuan
Room 403
East Block 2
SEG Park
Zhenxing Road, Futian
Shenzhen Guangdong 518044 / CN
05 / FAN, Liangliang
Room 403
East Block 2
SEG Park
Zhenxing Road, Futian
Shenzhen Guangdong 518044 / CN
06 / TANG, Linping
Room 403
East Block 2
SEG Park
Zhenxing Road, Futian
Shenzhen Guangdong 518044 / CN
07 / WENG, Leteng
Room 403
East Block 2
SEG Park
Zhenxing Road, Futian
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
08 / LIANG, Juanjuan
Room 403
East Block 2
SEG Park
Zhenxing Road, Futian
Shenzhen Guangdong 518044 / CN
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12863425.013.12.2012
WO2012CN86568
Priority number, dateCN2011144784928.12.2011         Original published format: CN201110447849
[2014/45]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013097615
Date:04.07.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800045
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/02
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERÖFFENTLICHUNG VON WERBEINHALTEN UND COMPUTERSPEICHERMEDIUM[2014/45]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PUBLISHING PROMOTIONAL CONTENTS AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM[2014/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉDITION DE CONTENUS PROMOTIONNELS ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE INFORMATIQUE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase18.07.2014Translation filed 
18.07.2014National basic fee paid 
18.07.2014Search fee paid 
18.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
18.12.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]CN101119517  (SHENZHEN RONGHE TECHNOLOGY CO [CN]);
 [A]CN101895872  (NANJING FENGHUO XINGKONG COMM DEV CO LTD);
 [A]CN102185917  (SHENZHEN 5G TECHNOLOGY CO LTD)