Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782276

EP2782276 - SIGNAL PROCESSING UNIT, AND INTERFERENCE CANCELLATION METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.02.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2014/39]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / PAN, Yongchao
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / LI, Bitao
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / XU, Liang
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2014/39]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/39]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date12863541.418.12.2012
WO2012CN86833
Priority number, dateCN20111045554130.12.2011         Original published format: CN201110455541
[2014/39]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013097627
Date:04.07.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782276
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04J13/00, H04B1/7107
[2014/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/39]
TitleGerman:SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSEINHEIT UND INTERFERENZUNTERDRÜCKUNGSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM[2014/39]
English:SIGNAL PROCESSING UNIT, AND INTERFERENCE CANCELLATION METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM[2014/39]
French:UNITÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL, ET PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME D'ANNULATION DE BROUILLAGE[2014/39]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2014Translation filed 
19.06.2014National basic fee paid 
19.06.2014Search fee paid 
19.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/39]
27.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.06.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US7324584  (VIGNERON PHILIP JULIUS [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-15 * column 3, line 19 - column 8, line 9; figures 1, 2B, 9 * [I] 3,9;
 [X]WO0129983  (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * page 16, line 20 - page 18, line 12; figure 9 *
International search[X]CN1505294  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]);
 [A]CN1400758  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]);
 [A]CN101127536  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]);
 [XP]CN102545958  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD)