Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798530

EP2798530 - CONTEXT-BASED DEVICE ACTION PREDICTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 22.05.2019  [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/22]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHU, David
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / KANSAL, Aman
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / LIU, Jie
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / YAN, Tingxin
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Fischer, Michael Maria , et al
Olswang Germany LLP
IP
Rosental 4
80331 Munich / DE
Application number, filing date12863619.819.12.2012
WO2012US70431
Priority number, dateUS20111334070230.12.2011         Original published format: US201113340702
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013101567
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798530
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/44, G06F9/445, G06N99/00
[2015/23]
Former International [2014/45]G06F17/20, G06F3/048, G06F15/16, G06F9/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:KONTEXTBASIERTE AKTIONSVORHERSAGE FÜR EINE VORRICHTUNG[2014/45]
English:CONTEXT-BASED DEVICE ACTION PREDICTION[2014/45]
French:PRÉDICTION D'ACTION DE DISPOSITIF BASÉE SUR LE CONTEXTE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2014National basic fee paid 
25.06.2014Search fee paid 
25.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
13.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/21]
21.11.2018Date of oral proceedings
03.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/21]
03.01.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.05.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US2004193813  (NGUYEN PHUONG VIET [US] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0022] *;
 [A]US2011028138  (DAVIES-MOORE ALEXANDER [GB] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0055] *
 [XI]  - DAVID CHU AMAN KANSAL JIE LIU FENG ZHAO MICROSOFT RESEARCH REDMOND, "Mobile Apps: It's Time to Move Up to CondOS", USENIX,, (20110415), pages 1 - 5, XP061010139 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * [I] 9-11
 [A]  - DAISUKE KAMISAKA ET AL, "Operation Prediction for Context-Aware User Interfaces of Mobile Phones", APPLICATIONS AND THE INTERNET, 2009. SAINT '09. NINTH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, New York, New York, USA, (20090720), doi:10.1109/SAINT.2009.12, ISBN 978-0-7695-3700-9, pages 16 - 22, XP055106610 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SAINT.2009.12
 [A]  - MATTHIAS BÖHMER ET AL, "Falling asleep with Angry Birds, Facebook and Kindle", MOBILEHCI '11 PROCEEDINGS OF THE 13TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON HUMAN COMPUTER INTERACTION WITH MOBILE DEVICES AND SERVICES, (20110830), doi:10.1145/2037373.2037383, ISBN 978-1-45-030541-9, page 47, XP055145079 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2037373.2037383
International search[Y]US2011078758  (TOBIAS M. KOHLENBERG ET AL.);
 [Y]US2009224867  (KEVIN MICHAEL O'SHAUGHNESSY ET AL.);
 [A]US2011014933  (AMIT KARMARKAR ET AL.);
 [A]US2010112955  (DILIP KRISHNASWAMY ET AL.);
 [A]US2006155664  (KOJI MORIKAWA ET AL.)