Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799163

EP2799163 - Mo-Si-B-BASED ALLOY POWDER, RAW METAL MATERIAL POWDER, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING Mo-Si-B-BASED ALLOY POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
A.L.M.T. Corp.
11-11 Shiba 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0014 / JP
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAZAKI, Shigekazu
c/o A.L.M.T.Corp.
2 Iwasekoshi-machi
Toyama-shi Toyama 931-8543 / JP
02 / TSUJI, Ayuri
c/o A.L.M.T.Corp.
2 Iwasekoshi-machi
Toyama-shi Toyama 931-8543 / JP
03 / KATOH, Masahiro
c/o A.L.M.T.Corp.
2 Iwasekoshi-machi
Toyama-shi Toyama 931-8543 / JP
04 / NAKABAYASHI, Seiji
c/o A.L.M.T.Corp.
2 Iwasekoshi-machi
Toyama-shi Toyama 931-8543 / JP
05 / IKEGAYA, Akihiko
c/o A.L.M.T.Corp.
2 Iwasekoshi-machi
Toyama-shi Toyama 931-8543 / JP
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date12863978.821.12.2012
WO2012JP83218
Priority number, dateJP2011028832128.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011288321
[2014/45]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013099791
Date:04.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2799163
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:B22F1/00, B22F9/04, C22C1/04, C22C27/04
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:MO-SI-B-BASIERTES LEGIERUNGSPULVER, PULVER AUS ROHMETALLMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MO-SI-B-BASIERTEN LEGIERUNGSPULVERS[2014/45]
English:Mo-Si-B-BASED ALLOY POWDER, RAW METAL MATERIAL POWDER, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING Mo-Si-B-BASED ALLOY POWDER[2014/45]
French:POUDRE D'ALLIAGE À BASE DE Mo-Si-B, POUDRE DE MATIÈRE PREMIÈRE MÉTALLIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ PRODUISANT UNE POUDRE D'ALLIAGE À BASE DE Mo-Si-B[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase28.07.2014Translation filed 
28.07.2014National basic fee paid 
28.07.2014Search fee paid 
28.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
11.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/46]
06.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/46]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2006169369  (JEHANNO PASCAL [AT]) [Y] 4,8,9 * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] - [0013]; example 1; claims 1-15 *;
 [Y]US2006285990  (JEHANNO PASCAL [AT] ET AL) [Y] 10-12 * paragraphs [0020] - [0023] - [0034]; claims 1-13; table 1 *;
 [Y]EP2208558  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 6,7,13 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0017] , [0022] *
 [X]  - RAWN C ET AL, "The crystal structure and thermal expansion of Mo5SiB2", INTERMETALLICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 0966-9795, (20010301), pages 209 - 216, (20010301), XP027383223 [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * * page 210, column 2, paragraph 2 *
 [T]  - GARLEA V O ET AL, "The high-resolution powder diffractometer at the high flux isotope reactor", APPLIED PHYSICS A; MATERIALS SCIENCE & PROCESSING, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20100316), vol. 99, no. 3, ISSN 1432-0630, pages 531 - 535, XP019844545 [T] 1-3,5 * page 534; figure 5 *
 [Y]  - KRUGER M ET AL, "Mechanically alloyed Mo-Si-B alloys with a continuous alpha-Mo matrix and improved mechanical properties", INTERMETALLICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, vol. 16, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.INTERMET.2008.04.015, ISSN 0966-9795, (20080701), pages 933 - 941, (20080602), XP022733493 [Y] 4,6-13 * abstract * * page 937, column 1 - column 2 * * page 939 - page 941 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.intermet.2008.04.015
International search[A]JP2004115833  (PRESIDENT OF TOHOKU UNIVERSITY);
 [A]JP2008114258  (HITACHI, LTD.);
 [A]JP2005314715  (JAPAN NEW METALS CO., LTD.);
 [A]  - KAZUHIRO ITO ET AL., "Mechanical and Functional Properties of Mo-Si-B Ternary Alloys for Ultra- high Temperature Applications", MATERIA JAPAN, THE JAPAN INSTITUTE OF METALS, (20050220), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 131 - 137, XP008174312

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2320/materia.44.131
by applicantUS7767138
 US5595616
 US5593156
 JP2004115833
 JP2008246553
    - "Structural Intermetallics", NUNES, C. A.; SAKIDJA, R.; PEREPEZKO, J. H., TMS, (1997), pages 831 - 839