Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801091

EP2801091 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR JOINT USE OF SPEECH AND TEXT-BASED FEATURES FOR SENTIMENT DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/46]METHODS, APPARATUSES AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS FOR JOINT USE OF SPEECH AND TEXT-BASED FEATURES FOR SENTIMENT DETECTION
[2017/19]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
[2017/37]
Former [2015/32]For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2014/46]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / ADLER, Mark
33 Woodpark Circle
Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US
02 / KISS, Imre Attila
3 Wheeler Lane
Arlington, Massachusetts 02474 / US
03 / MAIRESSE, Francois
69 Phillips Street Apt. 1
Boston, Massachusetts 02114 / US
04 / POLIFRONI, Joseph
22 Parker Street
Arlington, Massachusetts 02474 / US
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Berggren Oy, Tampere
Visiokatu 1
33720 Tampere / FI
[2017/37]
Former [2014/46]Nokia Corporation
Intellectual Property Department
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Application number, filing date12864108.130.11.2012
[2017/37]
WO2012FI51193
Priority number, dateUS20121334268403.01.2012         Original published format: US201213342684
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013102696
Date:11.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801091
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2801091
Date:13.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:FI11.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G10L25/63, G10L15/08, G10L15/26, G06F17/27, G06F17/28, G01S19/01
[2015/33]
Former International [2014/46]G10L15/08, G10L15/26, G06F17/27, G06F17/28, G01S19/01
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUR GEMEINSAMEN NUTZUNG VON SPRACH- UND TEXTBASIERTEN MERKMALEN ZUR EMPFINDUNGSERKENNUNG[2017/19]
English:METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR JOINT USE OF SPEECH AND TEXT-BASED FEATURES FOR SENTIMENT DETECTION[2017/19]
French:PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET PRODUIT DE PROGRAMMES INFORMATIQUES POUR UNE UTILISATION CONJOINTE DE CARACTÉRISTIQUES TEXTUELLES ET VOCALES EN VUE DE LA DÉTECTION DE SENTIMENTS[2017/19]
Former [2014/46]VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNGEN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKTE ZUR GEMEINSAMEN NUTZUNG VON SPRACH- UND TEXTBASIERTEN MERKMALEN ZUR EMPFINDUNGSERKENNUNG
Former [2014/46]METHODS, APPARATUSES AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS FOR JOINT USE OF SPEECH AND TEXT-BASED FEATURES FOR SENTIMENT DETECTION
Former [2014/46]PROCÉDÉS, APPAREILS ET PRODUITS DE PROGRAMMES INFORMATIQUES POUR UNE UTILISATION CONJOINTE DE CARACTÉRISTIQUES TEXTUELLES ET VOCALES EN VUE DE LA DÉTECTION DE SENTIMENTS
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Search fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
03.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2017Fee for grant paid
03.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.08.2016
Opposition(s)14.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.11.2012
AT13.09.2017
CY13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SI13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
IE30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
GB13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU30.11.2012
AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SI13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
IE30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
GB13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SI13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
IE30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
GB13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
IE30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
GB13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/49]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
IE30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/45]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
CH30.11.2017
IE30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/43]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
MT30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/41]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
LU30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/33]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
SM13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
Former [2018/15]ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
Former [2018/12]ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
Former [2018/11]ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
RS13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
Former [2018/09]FI13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
NO13.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
NO13.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT13.09.2017
NO13.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2011004624  (BANSAL RAVI P [US] ET AL) [X] 1,5,11,15,16 * abstract * * page 5, paragraphs [0041]-[0042] * * page 6, paragraphs [0053]-[0054] * * figures 1,2,4 * [A] 2,12 [I] 3,4,6-10,13-15;
 [A]US2008215571  (HUANG SHEN [CN] ET AL) [A] 1,11,16 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs [0022]-[0024] * * page 2, paragraph [0028] - page 3, paragraph [0035] * * page 3, paragraphs [0040]-[0043] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]  - CAMELIN N ET AL, "Detection and Interpretation of Opinion Expressions in Spoken Surveys", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON AUDIO, SPEECH AND LANGUAGE PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (20100201), vol. 18, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TASL.2009.2028918, ISSN 1558-7916, pages 369 - 381, XP011329135 [A] 1,11,16 * abstract * * pages 376-378, paragraph [A. Survey Analysis Strategy] * * figure 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TASL.2009.2028918
International search[Y]US2011208522  (PEREG OREN [IL] ET AL.);
 [Y]US2011294525  (JONSSON HOEKAN LARS EMANUEL [SE]);
 [A]US2010121857  (ELMORE JOHN EDWARD [US] ET AL.)