Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801610

EP2801610 - CELL SEPARATION CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.08.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JAPAN TISSUE ENGINEERING CO., LTD.
209-1, Miyakitadori 6-chome
Gamagori-shi
Aichi 443-0022 / JP
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / SUGIURA, Makoto
c/o JAPAN TISSUE ENGINEERING CO., LTD.
209-1 Miyakitadori 6-chome
Gamagori-shi Aichi 443-0022 / JP
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[2019/40]
Former [2014/46]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date12864255.025.12.2012
[2019/40]
WO2012JP83462
Priority number, dateJP2012000013804.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012000138
[2014/46]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013103108
Date:11.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801610
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2801610
Date:02.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:C12M3/08, C12M1/00, C12N5/071
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZELLTRENNUNGSBEHÄLTER[2014/46]
English:CELL SEPARATION CONTAINER[2014/46]
French:RÉCIPIENT POUR SÉPARER DES CELLULES[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2014Translation filed 
27.06.2014National basic fee paid 
27.06.2014Search fee paid 
27.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
29.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2019Fee for grant paid
30.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
09.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
09.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
07.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]CN102212461  ;
 [X]JP2009095307  (OLYMPUS CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [A]JP4520855B  (HATA K. ET AL.) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2011117821  (TREMOLADA CARLO [IT]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1, 2a, 3; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]US2008199900  (SIGNORE ALBERTO [IT], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-3 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2011, no. 82, Database accession no. 2011-P09495, XP002743738 & CN102212461 A 20111012 (GEN HOSPITAL SECOND ARTILLERY CHINESE PL) [X] 1-3 * abstract *
International search[X]WO2011117821  (TREMOLADA CARLO [IT]);
 [Y]JP2001525686  (CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER);
 [Y]JP2008005840  (MILLIPORE CORP);
 [A]JP4520855B  (JAPAN TISSUE ENGINEERING CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2009038998  (OLYMPUS CORP)
 [X]  - HUANG SONG-BIN ET AL., "A tunable micro filter modulated by pneumatic pressure for cell separation.", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, (2009), vol. 142, pages 389 - 399, XP026641930

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.snb.2009.07.046
by applicantJP4520855B