Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2801736 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2801736



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 290
25.07.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
20.09.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
24.08.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.08.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.08.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
09.08.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
09.08.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
09.05.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
09.05.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.05.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.05.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 37
09.05.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 37
04.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
04.04.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
04.04.2017 Description Search / examination 1
04.04.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.12.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
02.12.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
10.11.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
10.11.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
30.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
30.06.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.09.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
28.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
28.09.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
28.09.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
28.09.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
26.03.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
09.03.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.03.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
09.03.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
24.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
16.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
01.08.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.08.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
01.08.2014 Description Search / examination 24
01.08.2014 Drawings Search / examination 10
01.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
22.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
22.07.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
16.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
30.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
30.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18
11.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
11.07.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
11.07.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 31