Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2801736


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019 [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
27.07.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
19.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
18.08.2017 (Expected) grant published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
16.08.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
16.08.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
15.08.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
08.05.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.04.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.11.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
11.07.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.07.2016 First examination report
05.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.10.2015 Amendment by applicant
13.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
06.03.2015 Change - classification published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
06.03.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
08.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
10.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
11.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
12.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication