Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801736

EP2801736 - HYDRAULIC AUTO TENSIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTN Corporation
3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / TANAKA Tadahisa
c/o NTN Corporation
1578 Higashikaizuka
Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-0037 / JP
02 / KITANO Satoshi
c/o NTN Corporation
1578 Higashikaizuka
Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-0037 / JP
03 / TAKANO Takehiro
c/o NTN Corporation
1578 Higashikaizuka
Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-0037 / JP
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2017/38]
Former [2014/46]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date12864470.521.12.2012
[2017/38]
WO2012JP83243
Priority number, dateJP2012000125606.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012001256
JP2012001289525.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012012895
[2014/46]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013103098
Date:11.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801736
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2801736
Date:20.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:F16H7/12
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HYDRAULISCHER SELBSTSPANNER[2014/46]
English:HYDRAULIC AUTO TENSIONER[2014/46]
French:TENDEUR HYDRAULIQUE AUTOMATIQUE[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase01.08.2014Translation filed 
01.08.2014National basic fee paid 
01.08.2014Search fee paid 
01.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
28.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2017Fee for grant paid
09.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.06.2016
Opposition(s)21.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.12.2012
AT20.09.2017
CY20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GB21.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IE21.12.2017
LU21.12.2017
MT21.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU21.12.2012
AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GB21.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IE21.12.2017
LU21.12.2017
MT21.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2019/30]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GB21.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IE21.12.2017
LU21.12.2017
MT21.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GB21.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IE21.12.2017
LU21.12.2017
MT21.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GB21.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IE21.12.2017
LU21.12.2017
MT21.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/45]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IE21.12.2017
LU21.12.2017
MT21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/43]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
LU21.12.2017
MT21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/35]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/15]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/12]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/11]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/09]FI20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005064970  (TANAKA KATSUSHI [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0028]; figure 3 *;
 [X]US2004087398  (TANAKA KATSUSHI [JP]) [X] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [A]FR2948742  (HUTCHINSON [FR]) [A] 1-14 * figures 3,4 *
International search[Y]JP2006046394  (HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2011027238  (NTN CORP.);
 [Y]JP2005299751  (NTN CORP.);
 [Y]JP2008180265  (NTN CORP.);
 [Y]JP2009121527  (OTICS CORP.);
 [A]JP2003287092  (HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2009264419  (NTN CORP.);
 [A]JP2010276152  (NTN CORP.)
ExaminationJP2009264419
by applicantJP2011027238