Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802005

EP2802005 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.10.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toppan Printing Co., Ltd.
5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku
Tokyo 110-8560 / JP
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / HAYASHI Kenta
c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO. LTD.
5-1 Taito 1-chome
Taito-ku
Tokyo 110-8560 / JP
02 / YAMAMOTO Katsumi
c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO. LTD.
5-1 Taito 1-chome
Taito-ku
Tokyo 110-8560 / JP
03 / NAKAMURA Makoto
c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO. LTD.
5-1 Taito 1-chome
Taito-ku
Tokyo 110-8560 / JP
04 / AKIYAMA Naoyuki
c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO. LTD.
5-1 Taito 1-chome
Taito-ku
Tokyo 110-8560 / JP
05 / TAGUCHI Kyosuke
c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO. LTD.
5-1 Taito 1-chome
Taito-ku
Tokyo 110-8560 / JP
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date12864530.628.12.2012
WO2012JP84110
Priority number, dateJP2012000115506.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012001155
[2014/46]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013103136
Date:11.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802005
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/3065, H01L21/311, H01L21/768, H01L23/48, H01L27/146, // H01L23/525
[2015/50]
Former International [2014/46]H01L21/3205, H01L21/3065, H01L21/768, H01L23/12, H01L23/522, H01L27/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
TitleGerman:HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/46]
English:SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME[2014/46]
French:DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2014Translation filed 
16.07.2014National basic fee paid 
16.07.2014Search fee paid 
16.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
06.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.10.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
28.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XDY]JP2007053149  (RENESAS TECH CORP) [XD] 1,2 * paragraphs [0040] - [0045]; figures 1, 4 * [Y] 3-6;
 [Y]JP2010251791  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [Y] 5,6 * paragraphs [0040] - [0052] - [0 58] - [0061]; figures 5-12 *;
 [YA]US2011291153  (YANG MING-KUN [TW], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0034] - [0048]; figure 5 * [A] 1,2,4-6;
 [Y]US2008283951  (NABE YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0093] , [0 99] - [0101] - [ 109]; figures 6, 8 *;
 [A]US2010013060  (LAMY YANN PIERRE ROGER [NL], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0035] - [0053]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2006094231  (LANE RALPH L [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 12] , [0 21] - [0024]; figure 2 *
International search[X]JP2003503855  (INTEL CORP.);
 [Y]JP2008288309  (SONY CORP);
 [Y]JP2003318178  (SEIKO EPSON CORP);
 [Y]JP2011003863  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [A]US2006046463  (WATKINS CHARLES M [US], et al);
 [A]JP2007311771  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al)
by applicantJP2011003863
 JP2007053149