Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2802005 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2802005



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 211
21.10.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.10.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.10.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
06.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.06.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
06.06.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
06.06.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
06.06.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
06.06.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
06.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.11.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
05.11.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.11.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 5
05.11.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
20.10.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
15.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
11.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.07.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.07.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
16.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
16.07.2014 Description Search / examination 43
16.07.2014 Drawings Search / examination 8
16.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
16.07.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
16.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
30.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 34
11.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
11.07.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
11.07.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 44