Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2802005

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure21.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Entry into regional phase16.07.2014Translation filed 
16.07.2014National basic fee paid 
16.07.2014Search fee paid 
16.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
28.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.11.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:12.11.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20140716
 
Event date:15.04.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:09.12.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H01L 23/525 20060101ALN20151030BHEP
 
Event date:09.12.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H01L 27/146 20060101ALI20151030BHEP
 
Event date:09.12.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H01L 21/3065 20060101AFI20151030BHEP
 
Event date:09.12.2015 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED (CORRECTED)
Effective DATE:20151105
 
Event date:09.12.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H01L 23/48 20060101ALI20151030BHEP
 
Event date:09.12.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H01L 21/311 20060101ALI20151030BHEP
 
Event date:09.12.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H01L 21/768 20060101ALI20151030BHEP