Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802991

EP2802991 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MANAGING CACHE ADMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SanDisk Technologies LLC
6900 Dallas Parkway
Suite 325
Plano, TX 75024 / US
[2016/32]
Former [2015/48]For all designated states
Longitude Enterprise Flash S.à.r.l.
208, Val des Bons Malades
2121 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
Fusion-io, Inc.
2855 E Cottonwood Parkway Box 100
Salt Lake City, UT 84121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TALAGALA, Nisha
1682 Prima Drive
Livermore, California 94550 / US
02 / SUNDARARAMAN, Swaminathan
2874 Paseo Lane
San Jose, California 95124 / US
 [2015/17]
Former [2014/47]01 / TALAGALA, Nisha
1682 Prima Drive
Livermore, California 94550 / US
02 / SUNDARARAMAN, Swaminathan
700 Agnew Road
Apt. 337
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]Korenberg, Alexander Tal , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date12864719.512.01.2012
WO2012US21094
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013105960
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802991
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR18.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F12/0866, G06F12/0888, G06F12/02
[2019/25]
Former International [2015/39]G06F12/08, G06F12/02
Former International [2014/47]G06F12/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG EINES ZWISCHENSPEICHERZUGANGS[2014/47]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MANAGING CACHE ADMISSION[2014/47]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA GESTION DE L'ADMISSION DANS UNE ANTÉMÉMOIRE[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase12.08.2014National basic fee paid 
12.08.2014Search fee paid 
12.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
10.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2003046493  (COULSON RICHARD L [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0020]; figures 1, 2 *;
 [Y]US2011258391  (ATKISSON DAVID [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0089] - [0091] - [0 93]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0098] - [0099]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0121] - [0124]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0119] , [ 128] , [ 134] * * paragraph [0230]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0289] *;
 [A]US2004128470  (HETZLER STEVEN ROBERT [US] ET AL) [A] 8,14 * paragraphs [0046] - [0048]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0051] - [0055]; figure 4 * * paragraphs [0061] - [0063]; figure 6a * * abstract *;
 [A]EP1522927  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0106] - [0112]; figure 6 *;
 [A]US2006106891  (MAHAR AARON S [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2007061511  (FABER ROBERT W [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0030]; figures 1-4; claims 1-30 *
International search[A]US2011258391  (ATKISSON DAVID ET AL.);
 [A]US2008034153  (CHARLES C. LEE ET AL.);
 [A]WO2008070173  (FLYNN, DAVID ET AL.);
 [A]US2011258512  (FLYNN, DAVID ET AL.)
by applicantUS2003046493
 US2011258391