Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2802991


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.12.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.11.2019 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
24.06.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.05.2019 Change - classification published on  19.06.2019  [2019/25]
17.05.2019 Change - classification published on  19.06.2019  [2019/25]
01.02.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.11.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.07.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.07.2018 First examination report
23.05.2018 Change - representative
19.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.05.2017 Change - representative
20.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.07.2016 Change - applicant published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
11.03.2016 Amendment by applicant
02.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.10.2015 Change - applicant published on  25.11.2015  [2015/48]
21.08.2015 Change - classification published on  23.09.2015  [2015/39]
21.08.2015 Change - classification published on  23.09.2015  [2015/39]
21.08.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  23.09.2015  [2015/39]
18.04.2015 Change - representative
20.03.2015 Change - inventor published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
14.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
13.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
20.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
17.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
11.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.08.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication