Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2802991 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280071235 EP12864719



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013105960Global Dossier 18.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US21094 12.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104303162BGlobal Dossier 27.03.2018B
CN104303162 21.01.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2012US21094 12.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2802991Global Dossier 23.09.2015A4
EP2802991 19.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US21094 12.01.2012