Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2803741

EP2803741 - METHOD OF POST WELD HEAT TREATMENT OF A LOW ALLOY STEEL PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/47]LOW ALLOY STEEL
[2019/09]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.02.2019
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / HIRATA, Hiroyuki
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
02 / OMURA, Tomohiko
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
03 / KOBAYASHI, Kenji
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
04 / KAWANO, Kaori
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
05 / TOMATSU, Kota
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
06 / OGAWA, Kazuhiro
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]01 / HIRATA, Hiroyuki
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
02 / OMURA, Tomohiko
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
03 / KOBAYASHI, Kenji
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
04 / KAWANO, Kaori
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
05 / TOMATSU, Kota
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
06 / OGAWA, Kazuhiro
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]Zimmermann & Partner
Josephspitalstr. 15
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date12864721.117.12.2012
WO2012JP82608
Priority number, dateJP2012000420412.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012004204
[2014/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013105396
Date:18.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2803741
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:C22C38/00, C21D9/08, C21D9/50, C22C38/14, C22C38/58, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/08, C22C38/12, C22C38/18
[2015/49]
Former International [2014/47]C22C38/00, C21D9/08, C21D9/50, C22C38/14, C22C38/58
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR WÄRMENACHBEHANDLUNG EINES NIEDRIGLEGIERTEN STAHLROHRES[2019/10]
English:METHOD OF POST WELD HEAT TREATMENT OF A LOW ALLOY STEEL PIPE[2019/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE APRÈS SOUDAGE D'UN TUYAU EN ACIER FAIBLEMENT ALLIÉ[2019/09]
Former [2014/47]LEGIERUNGSSTAHL
Former [2014/47]LOW ALLOY STEEL
Former [2014/47]ACIER FAIBLEMENT ALLIÉ
Entry into regional phase11.08.2014Translation filed 
11.08.2014National basic fee paid 
11.08.2014Search fee paid 
11.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
25.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
20.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.08.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
01.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2050833  (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0076]; example 1; table 1 *;
 [XI]EP1541252  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0077] * * claim 2 * * claim 4 * [I] 8;
 [XI]JP2008274405  (JFE STEEL KK) [X] 1-7,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0067]; tables 1,2 * [I] 8;
 [X]EP1764423  (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0055]; table 1 *;
 [X]EP2105516  (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0040]; table 1 * * abstract *;
 [X]JP2007270194  (JFE STEEL KK) [X] 1-5,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] *;
 [X]EP1568792  (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048]; table 1 * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054]; table 2 *;
 [X]EP0757113  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * abstract * * page 8 - page 14; tables 1,3,5 *;
 [X]JPH1177350  (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [X] 1-5,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0038]; table 1 * * paragraph [0041]; table 2 *;
 [X]JPH09194995  (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [X] 1-5 * abstract *
International search[X]JPH09256038  (NIPPON STEEL CORP);
 [X]JP2001121289  (NIPPON KOKAN KK);
 [X]JPH08309428  (SUMITOMO METAL IND);
 [X]JP2008013808  (JFE STEEL KK);
 [X]JP2008274405  (JFE STEEL KK);
 [X]JP2007270194  (JFE STEEL KK);
 [X]JPH0748621  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO);
 [X]JPH1177350  (NIPPON KOKAN KK)
by applicantJPS5255746
 JPS6336639
 JP2002060894
 JP2010024504
 JP2007321228
    - MASANORI KOWAKA, Corrosion damage and anticorrosion engineering of metal, AGNE CORPORATION, (19830825), page 198