Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2803517

EP2803517 - STRUCTURE FOR VEHICLE SIDE DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.07.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / FUJIHARA, Akito
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
02 / TORII, Nobuyuki
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/47]
Application number, filing date12865045.411.01.2012
[2018/01]
WO2012JP50369
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013105228
Date:18.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2803517
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2803517
Date:03.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:B60J5/00, B60J5/04
[2015/35]
Former International [2014/47]B60J5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STRUKTUR FÜR EINE FAHRZEUGSEITENTÜR[2014/47]
English:STRUCTURE FOR VEHICLE SIDE DOOR[2014/47]
French:STRUCTURE DE PORTIÈRE LATÉRALE POUR VÉHICULE[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2014Translation filed 
07.07.2014National basic fee paid 
07.07.2014Search fee paid 
07.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.02.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
07.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
22.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.2017Fee for grant paid
16.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.06.2016
Opposition(s)05.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SI03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
IE11.01.2018
LU11.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
GB03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
[2019/35]
Former [2019/13]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SI03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
IE11.01.2018
LU11.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
GB03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2019/09]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
IE11.01.2018
LU11.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
LU11.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
LU11.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
LU11.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
LU11.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
LU11.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
Former [2018/34]FI03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US5599057  (HIRAHARA SHINICHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, lines 12-36 * * figure 10 *;
 [X]JP2008044575  (TOYOTA AUTO BODY CO LTD; TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,5,7 * abstract * * figure 6 *;
 [X]JPH07117476  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * figures 3, 5 *
International search[X]JP2008044575  (TOYOTA AUTO BODY CO., LTD., TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.);
 [A]JP2008254660  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.);
 [A]JP2010143453  (MAZDA MOTOR CORP.);
 [A]JPH07117476  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.);
 [A]JP2005138661  (NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2007253637  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.)
by applicantJP2007203895