Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2803396 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2803396



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 254
04.01.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
22.05.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
04.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.05.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
04.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.05.2018 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
16.03.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
01.02.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.01.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
16.01.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.10.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.10.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.10.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.10.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
02.10.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 28
16.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.05.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
16.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.05.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.03.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
15.03.2017 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
15.03.2017 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
09.11.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
09.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
31.08.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
31.08.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.08.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
09.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.11.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
09.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
09.11.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
09.11.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
09.11.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
09.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.06.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
19.05.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.05.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
19.05.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
12.05.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
28.04.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
25.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.03.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
25.03.2015 Miscellaneous requests for changes concerning the applicant Search / examination 1
25.03.2015 Request for assignment Search / examination 1
22.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
01.09.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
18.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
28.07.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
10.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.07.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.07.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
10.07.2014 Description Search / examination 16
10.07.2014 Drawings Search / examination 7
10.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.02.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
07.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 14
18.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
18.07.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
18.07.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 22