Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2803396


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
04.01.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  06.02.2019  [2019/06]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
03.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.09.2018  [2018/36]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
18.05.2018 Change - applicant published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
26.01.2018 (Expected) grant published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
22.01.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
22.01.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
17.01.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
08.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.10.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.09.2017 Change - German title published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
16.05.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.03.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.11.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.09.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.09.2016 First examination report
11.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.11.2015 Amendment by applicant
15.05.2015 Change - classification published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
15.05.2015 Change - classification published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
15.05.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
08.05.2015 Change - applicant published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
13.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
08.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
17.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication