Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2803396

EP2803396 - SAMPLE-CONCENTRATING CONTAINER AND SAMPLE-CONCENTRATING METHOD USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PHC Holdings Corporation
2-38-5 Nishishimbashi
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8433 / JP
[2018/25]
Former [2015/24]For all designated states
Panasonic Healthcare Holdings Co., Ltd.
2-38-5 Nishishimbashi
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8433 / JP
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
Panasonic Healthcare Co., Ltd.
2131-1 Minamigata
Toon-shi
Ehime 791-0395 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FUKUHARA, Takaomi
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual P. Center, Planning and M. Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61
Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / NANJO, Toshifumi
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual P. Center, Planning and M. Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61
Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/47]
Application number, filing date12865157.727.12.2012
[2018/09]
WO2012JP08391
Priority number, dateJP2012000372212.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012003722
[2014/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013105204
Date:18.07.2013
Language:JA
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2803396
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2803396
Date:28.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:B01D1/00, B04B15/08, G01N1/10, G01N33/48, B01L3/00, G01N1/40
[2015/25]
Former International [2014/47]B01D1/00, B04B15/08, G01N1/10, G01N33/48
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PROBENKONZENTRIERUNGSBEHÄLTER UND ENTSPRECHENDES PROBENKONZENTRIERUNGSVERFAHREN[2017/43]
English:SAMPLE-CONCENTRATING CONTAINER AND SAMPLE-CONCENTRATING METHOD USING SAME[2014/47]
French:CONTENANT CONCENTRATEUR D'ÉCHANTILLON ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONCENTRATION D'ÉCHANTILLON L'UTILISANT[2014/47]
Former [2014/47]PROBENKONZENTRIERUNGSBEHÄLTER UND PROBENKONZENTRIERUNGSVERFAHREN DAMIT
Entry into regional phase10.07.2014Translation filed 
10.07.2014National basic fee paid 
10.07.2014Search fee paid 
10.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
09.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2018Fee for grant paid
16.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.08.2016
Opposition(s)29.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
28.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/13]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5389265  (LUOMA II ROBERT P [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-12,14 * column 1, lines 5-13; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 39-58 * * column 4, lines 5-10; claim 8 * * column 6, lines 59-68 * [I] 1-15;
 [XI]US5785925  (U REN JACK [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-12,14 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 12; figures 1-3 * [I] 1-15;
 [XI]US2002081569  (ANDERSON NORMAN G [US]) [X] 1-3,6-10 * paragraphs [0058] , [0059]; figure 1 * [I] 5,15;
 [A]US4226669  (VILARDI FRANK FRANK VILARDI [US]) [A] 15 * column 1, lines 5-24; figures 1,2 * * column 3, lines 7-68 *
International search[A]JP2003531381  (DISCOVERY PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC.);
 [A]JP2003302319  (YOUTH ENGINEERING CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2004028819  (HIYOSHI CORP.)
by applicantJP2003021583